Ruegner v. Sun Pet, LTD
Plaintiff: Peter vonLehe Ruegner
Defendant: Sun Pet, LTD
Case Number: 2:2020cv03549
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun Pet, LTD re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Moore, Julie)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Peter vonLehe Ruegner P.O. Box 40 St. George, SC 29477. (hada, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Plaintiff is directed to submit fully completed and signed answers to the Court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.), which are attached to this order, within twenty-one days from the date this Order is entered (plus three days for mail time). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/16/2020. (hada, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Peter vonLehe Ruegner P.O. Box 40 St. George, SC 29477 (hada, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 11/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/16/2020. (hada, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Sun Pet LTD's ANSWER to Complaint by Sun Pet, LTD.(Moore, Julie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sun Pet, LTD. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Grevey, Kara)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun Pet, LTD (Moore, Julie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sun Pet, LTD.(hada, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020CP1801447. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9395369), filed by Sun Pet, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Supporting Documents)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruegner v. Sun Pet, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pet, LTD
Represented By: Kara Shea Grevey
Represented By: Julie Lauren Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter vonLehe Ruegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?