Shernoff et al v. Andino et al
Plaintiff: DSCC and JoAnn Shernoff
Defendant: Clifford J Edler, Scott Moseley, Howard M Knapp, Marci Andino, Linda McCall, JoAnne Day and John Wells
Petitioner: Senator Harvey Peeler and James ("Jay") H. Lucas
Intervenor Defendant: South Carolina Republican Party and Speaker of the South James H. Lucas
Interested Party: Albertus Clea, Family Unit, George Hopkins and League of Women Voters of South Carolina
Case Number: 2:2020cv03654
Filed: October 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lambert, William)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Sopen Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice for JoAnn Shernoff. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/28/2020.(sshe, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion for William B. Stafford to Appear Pro Hac Vice for JoAnn Shernoff. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/28/2020.(sshe, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac Vice for JoAnn Shernoff. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/28/2020.(sshe, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: In light of the Court's order of October 27, 2020 in the League of Women Voters case on essentially the identical issues raised by Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction in this case, the Court finds that the grant of any injunctive relief in this case would be duplicative and wholly unnecessary. Consequently, Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. #4 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/27/20.(ltap, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 30 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by JoAnn Shernoff. Marci Andino served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; JoAnne Day served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Clifford J Edler served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Linda McCall served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; Scott Moseley served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020; John Wells served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Tobin, Thomas) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/28/2020) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/28/2020 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Supplement the Record and Request that the Court Take Judicial Notice by JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript Excerpt)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sopen Shah ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9424390) by JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Stafford ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9424369) by JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2020: #3 Exhibit Additional Certificate of Good Standing) (sshe, ).
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Crum, Mary)
October 20, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells, filed by JoAnn Shernoff. Service due by 1/19/2021 (Tobin, Thomas)
October 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce V. Spiva ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9420550) by JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/21/2020 to add attachment as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Hearing Response filed by Family Unit, League of Women Voters of South Carolina, George Hopkins, Albertus Clea.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/27/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Dunn, Susan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Hearing Response filed by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/27/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lambert, William)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William Grayson Lambert on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Lambert, William)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene by South Carolina Republican Party. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Thomas Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Middleton Order Granting Motion to Intervene)No proposed order.(Tyson, Robert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purposes of Hearing by JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Intervene by James H. Lucas, Harvey Peeler. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Susan) Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party as filer, correct role as movant for newly added parties(sshe, ).
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Scott Moseley. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Linda McCall. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Clifford J Edler. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to JoAnne Day. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Wells. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Howard M Knapp. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marci Andino. (asni, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. Judge Childs determined that this case is not related to 3:20-1552. (glev, )
October 18, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by DSCC.(asni, )
October 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DSCC, JoAnn Shernoff. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 March 30, 2020 Letter from M. Andino, #3 Exhibit 2 Commission Election Timeline, #4 Exhibit 3 Commission Website - New Absentee Rules, #5 Exhibit 4 Shernoff Decl. in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 5 NCSL Website Table)No proposed order.(asni, )
October 18, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by DSCC, JoAnn Shernoff.(asni, )
October 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9412989.), filed by JoAnn Shernoff, DSCC. Service due by 1/19/2021(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shernoff et al v. Andino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J Edler
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moseley
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard M Knapp
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Andino
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCall
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnne Day
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wells
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Thomas John Tobin
Represented By: William Ben Stafford
Represented By: Sopen B Shah
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Shernoff
Represented By: Thomas John Tobin
Represented By: William Ben Stafford
Represented By: Sopen B Shah
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: South Carolina Republican Party
Represented By: Robert E Tyson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Speaker of the South James H. Lucas
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Albertus Clea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Family Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: George Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: League of Women Voters of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Senator Harvey Peeler
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James ("Jay") H. Lucas
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?