DeAnza Domestic Water Improvement District of Pima County, Arizona v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: DeAnza Domestic Water Improvement District of Pima County, Arizona
Defendant: 3M Company, Du Pont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, Dowdupont Inc, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Corteva Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv03838
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 4:20-cv-00439, DeAnza Domestic Water Improvement District of Pima County, Arizona v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-3838-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 12, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 6.A, 6.B, 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2020 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 4:20-cv-00439. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 2, 2020 Remark: Case Transferred to the District of South Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-37) Transferring Case to the District of South Carolina Re MDL-2873. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Chemguard Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18779323. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-439-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIEVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Service of Transmittal re: Letter, Summons, Complaint, Notice, Waiver upon The Corporation Trust Company, Wilmington, DE on behalf of Tyco Fire Products LP via Priority Mail on 9/25/2020. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International PLC for Tyco Fire Products LP. (Landolt, Lukas) (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Control International PLC for Chemguard Incorporated. (Landolt, Lukas) (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number CV2020 3734. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18779323 filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Incorporated. (Landolt, Lukas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Records, #4 Exhibit Verification, #5 Exhibit Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge)(MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeAnza Domestic Water Improvement District of Pima County, Arizona v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdupont Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnza Domestic Water Improvement District of Pima County, Arizona
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?