Hoffman, et al v American Express Company, et al
Plaintiff: Chandel Richard Hoffman and Black Hills Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Wellington Management Co., LLP, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., American Express Company, Dodge & Cox, BlackRock, Inc., SSgA Funds Management, Inc. and Vanguard Group, Inc., The
Case Number: 2:2020cv03904
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chandel Richard Hoffman. (filed at the direction of chambers) (dsto, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 9 TEXT Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Chandel Richard Hoffman,2155 Morris Baker Blvd., Apt. #4109, N.Charleston, SC, 29504-4791, 168 Larch Avenue, Teaneck, NJ, 07666 and 11 North Poplar Ave., Andrews, SC, 29510 (dsto, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: "You filed a notice of change of address only in Case #20-3902. You have the following cases pending: #20-3769, #20-3787, #20-3801, #20-3903 and #20-3904. The court is changing your address in all pending cases to the address provided in the notice of change of address from Case #20-3902, unless you notify the court otherwise within 10 days of the date of this Order." Response due by December 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/01/2020. (dsto, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Chandel Richard Hoffman.(dsto, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #4 Proper Form Order w/NEF and Civil Complaint, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Chandel Richard Hoffman, 11 North Poplar Ave., Andrews,SC, 29510 (dsto, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Plaintiff Black Hills Holdings, LLC, must obtain counsel and counsel must file a Notice of Appearance in this Court within 30 days from the date this Order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/17/2020. (dsto, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Company, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., BlackRock, Inc., Dodge & Cox, SSgA Funds Management, Inc., Vanguard Group, Inc., The, Wellington Management Co., LLP (Filing fee $400 receipt number SCX300090550), filed by Chandel Richard Hoffman. Service due by 2/8/2021.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman, et al v American Express Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Management Co., LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge & Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackRock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSgA Funds Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Group, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandel Richard Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Hills Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?