United States of America v. Manigo Brothers et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Manigo Brothers, Brandy N Manigo, Michael Smith, JaDaris S Manigo, Best Supply Inc, Theodosia Manigo, Colleton, County of, Access Limited LLC, Stacy M Holmes, Terrence D Manigo, Sherwin Williams Co, Builders FirstSource-Southeast Group LLC, Manigo Brothers LLC, Bruce Manigo, John Doe, Donnell Manigo, Mary Roe, Farmers and Merchants Bank and Temeka M Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv03940
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Builders FirstSource-Southeast Group LLC, Colleton, County of, Farmers and Merchants Bank (jbry, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Colleton County, S.C. byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Builders FirstSource byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Farmers and Merchant Bank byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Builders FirstSource-Southeast Group LLC served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Farmers and Merchants Bank served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Colleton, County of served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Donnell Manigo served on 11/27/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Mary Roe. (jbry, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Access Limited LLC, Best Supply Inc, Builders FirstSource-Southeast Group LLC, Colleton, County of, Farmers and Merchants Bank, Stacy M Holmes, Brandy N Manigo, Bruce Manigo, Donnell Manigo, JaDaris S Manigo, Terrence D Manigo, Theodosia Manigo, Manigo Brothers, Sherwin Williams Co, Michael Smith, Temeka M Washington. (jbry, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (jbry, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(jbry, ) Modified on 11/12/2020 to correct filing date(jbry, ).
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Legal Description, #2 Exhibit 2, Promissory Notes, #3 Exhibit 3, Mortgages)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Manigo Brothers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manigo Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy N Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JaDaris S Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodosia Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleton, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Limited LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy M Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence D Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin Williams Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders FirstSource-Southeast Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manigo Brothers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnell Manigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers and Merchants Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temeka M Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine McLean Ryan
Represented By: Walker Heinitsh Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?