Hammond v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: Jessie Jermaine Hammond
Defendant: Sara Rafal, Sara Myers and Alyssa K Peters
Case Number: 2:2020cv04048
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order with required documents, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Jessie Jermaine Hammond 418 Clarine Drive Goose Creek, SC 29445 (hada, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERENCE #8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/14/2021.(hada, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/14/2021. (hada, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jessie Jermaine Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jessie Jermaine Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sara Myers, Alyssa K Peters, Sara Rafal, filed by Jessie Jermaine Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Rafal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa K Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Jermaine Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?