Doyle v. Pegasus Residential LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E Doyle
Defendant: Cindy Brown and Pegasus Residential LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04371
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #25 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Ronald E Doyle 2017 Shields Lane Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 (hada, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/26/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/29/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/27/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/27/2021, Discovery due by 5/27/2021, Motions due by 7/26/2021, Mediation Due by 6/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/27/2021. (hada, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC.(Stumpe, Michele)
January 22, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC, filed by Ronald E Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Ronald E Doyle 2017 Shields Lane Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 (hada, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/06/2021.(hada, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Response filed by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC. (Stumpe, Michele)
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 Withdrawal of Motions: #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Pegasus Residential LLC, Cindy Brown.. (Stumpe, Michele)
December 31, 2020 Filing 16 Withdrawal of Motions: #4 MOTION to DismissMOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pegasus Residential LLC, Cindy Brown.. (Stumpe, Michele)
December 30, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Ronald E Doyle 2017 Shields Lane Mount Pleasant, SC 29466 (cpeg, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Ronald E Doyle, 2017 Shields Lane, Mount Pleasant, SC 29466. (vdru, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is ordered that Matthew R. Rosenkoff, who represents Defendants, Pegasus Residential LLC and Cindy Brown is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/29/2020.(vdru, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- Any future filings in this case must be sent to the Clerk of Court, Post Office Box 835, Charleston, South Carolina 29402. You are ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing if your address changes for any reason. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/28/2020. (cpeg, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew R. Rosenkoff ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9554476) by Pegasus Residential LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Application for Matthew R. Rosenkoff, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew R. Rosenkoff, #3 Proposed Order Order on Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew R. Rosenkoff)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Stumpe, Michele)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronald E Doyle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Ronald E Doyle. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response filed by Ronald E Doyle.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(hada, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(vdru, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(vdru, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC.(vdru, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC. (vdru, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-4338. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9539018), filed by Cindy Brown, Pegasus Residential LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Notice of Filing Notice of Removal). (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Pegasus Residential LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Brown
Represented By: Michele L Stumpe
Represented By: Matthew R Rosenkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Residential LLC
Represented By: Michele L Stumpe
Represented By: Matthew R Rosenkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?