Brangaccio et al v. New Age Contractors LLC
Plaintiff: Martin Donathan, John Brangaccio and Chris Mather
Defendant: New Age Contractors LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01256
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by New Age Contractors LLC.(Smith, Steven)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Age Contractors LLC.(Smith, Steven)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ordered that Scott Brady and Philip Bohrer, who represent the Plaintiffs, are granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 6/4/2021.(vdru, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip Bohrer ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9878133) by John Brangaccio. Response to Motion due by 6/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Application/Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Court Admissions, #3 Exhibit SC Admissions, #4 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ventura, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Brady ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9878060) by John Brangaccio. Response to Motion due by 6/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Application/Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Court Admissions, #3 Exhibit SC Admissions, #4 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Ventura, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant is granted until June 21, 2021 to file a responsive pleading. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/27/2021.(vdru, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by New Age Contractors LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Steven)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by John Brangaccio as to New Age Contractors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Signed and returned Certified Mail Receipt)(Ventura, David)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Complaint, Consent to Join for Chris Mather by David J Ventura on behalf of John Brangaccio (Ventura, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Brangaccio, Martin Donathan. (Ventura, David). Attachment from entry #5 removed and filed separately by Clerk. (vdru, ) Modified on 4/30/2021 to edit text. (vdru, ).
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Brangaccio and Martin Donathan. (Attachments: # 1 LR 26.01 Answers Amended Answers to LR 26.01)(Ventura, David) Modified on 4/30/2021 to remove attachment and file separately as entry #6. (vdru, ). Modified to add filer on 4/30/2021 (vdru, ).
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Age Contractors LLC. (vdru, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Brangaccio, Martin Donathan.(vdru, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Age Contractors LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9806004.), filed by John Brangaccio, Martin Donathan. Service due by 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join signed by J. Brangaccio, #2 Consent to Join signed by Martin Donathan).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brangaccio et al v. New Age Contractors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Age Contractors LLC
Represented By: Steven L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Donathan
Represented By: David J Ventura
Represented By: Scott E Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brangaccio
Represented By: David J Ventura
Represented By: Scott E Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mather
Represented By: David J Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?