HERNANDEZ-ADORNO v. LMD & ASSC., LLC
Plaintiff: Efrain Hernandez-Adorno
Defendant: LMD & Assc., LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01519
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Josephson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9984676) by Efrain Hernandez-Adorno. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tuck, Thomas)
July 27, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Motion/Telephone Hearing held on 7/27/2021 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LMD & Assc., LLC. All parties were present on the call. The Court will issue an order. Court Reporter Karen Martin. (cmur, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Richard M. Schreiber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 07/22/2021.(hcor, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Schreiber ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9972923) by Efrain Hernandez-Adorno. Response to Motion due by 8/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tuck, Thomas)
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by LMD & Assc., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and to Stay Discovery - ECF No. 252 US District Court District of New Jersey, #2 Exhibit 2 - Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and to Stay Discovery - ECF No. 252-1 US District Court District of New Jersey, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certified Translation of Guidelines for Interpretation of Puerto Rican Labor Law)(Burton, Stephanie)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF JOINDER Notice of Consents to Join as Party Plaintiffs by Thomas Christopher Tuck on behalf of Efrain Hernandez-Adorno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Consent Forms)(Tuck, Thomas)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion by Lee Roy Sepulvado-Ramos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/6/2021.(jbry, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/6/2021.(jbry, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee Roy Sepulvado-Ramos ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9939771) by LMD & Assc., LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burton, Stephanie)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9939767) by LMD & Assc., LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burton, Stephanie)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Telephonic Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 7/27/2021 at 1:30 PM before Honorable David C Norton. Call-in instructions will be distributed at a later date. (jbry, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Efrain Hernandez-Adorno.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/7/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - A. Fuentes Letter to Court dated March 25, 2021, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Order re Transfer & Severance, #5 Exhibit 5 - 250j Prescriptive term, #6 Exhibit 6 - 250j Trmino prescriptivo, #7 Exhibit 7 - 185l Indemnity for discharge without just cause-Prescription of rights, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ley 180-1998, Ley de Salario Minimo, Vacaciones y Licencia por Enfermedad de Puerto Rico)(Tuck, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 6/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/23/2021.(jbry, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants Motion To Dismiss by Efrain Hernandez-Adorno. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tuck, Thomas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christopher Tuck on behalf of Efrain Hernandez-Adorno (Tuck, Thomas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Augustus Consta Hargrove, II on behalf of Efrain Hernandez-Adorno (Hargrove, Theodore)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LMD & Assc., LLC.(Burton, Stephanie)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by LMD & Assc., LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Marked Up Proposed 2nd Amended Collective Action & Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - New Jersey No Opt-In Notices)No proposed order.(Burton, Stephanie)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H Burton on behalf of LMD & Assc., LLC (Burton, Stephanie)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LMD & Assc., LLC.(Burton, Stephanie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF TRANSFER (jbry, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/21/2021) (jbry, ).
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-11507. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Complaint in Hernandez-Adorno v. LMD & Assocs. (18cv17233 DE 343-1) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina; The Complaint in Rodriguez-Ortiz v. H.P. Services Corp. (18cv17233 DE 343-2) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico; The Complaint in Ojeda v. Kallberg Industries, LLC (18cv17233 DE 343-3) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; The Complaint in Ojeda v. Kennett Consulting, LLC (18cv17233 DE 343-4) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; The Complaint in Rivas Fernandez v. Bluesource (18cv17233 DE 343-5) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina; The Complaint in Gerena v. Able Innovations (18cv17233 DE 343-6) shall be severed, assigned its own civil number, and venue transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida; All claims not severed and transferred shall remain in this District, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/19/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/21/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LMD & ASSC., LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by EFRAIN HERNANDEZ-ADORNO.(ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/21/2021.]
May 19, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #2 Order. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ-ADORNO v. LMD & ASSC., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMD & Assc., LLC
Represented By: BORIS BROWNSTEIN
Represented By: Albeniz Couret-Fuentes
Represented By: Lee R Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Stephanie H Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Hernandez-Adorno
Represented By: DANA M. CIMERA
Represented By: Richard M Schreiber
Represented By: Theodore Augustus Consta Hargrove, II
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Tuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?