T-Zone Health Inc v. SouthStar Capital LLC
Plaintiff: T-Zone Health Inc
Defendant: SouthStar Capital LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01555
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by T-Zone Health Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/3/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lydon, Thomas)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SouthStar Capital LLC.(Tierney, Nicholas)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SouthStar Capital LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Tierney, Nicholas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SouthStar Capital LLC. (jbry, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by T-Zone Health Inc.(jbry, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SouthStar Capital LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9868406.), filed by T-Zone Health Inc. Service due by 8/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Invoice T39237, #2 Exhibit B email acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit C invoice T39605, #4 Exhibit D email and approval of invoice, #5 Exhibit E email dated August 28,2020)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Zone Health Inc v. SouthStar Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SouthStar Capital LLC
Represented By: Dustin J Pitts
Represented By: Lindsey W Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Zone Health Inc
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?