City of Galesburg v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Galesburg
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Deepwater Chemicals Inc, National Foam Inc, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Angus International Safety Group LTD, BASF Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, Chemicals Incorporated, Fire Products GP Holding LLC, Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products L.P., Nation Ford Chemical Company, The Chemours Company, Archroma U.S. Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Carrier Global Corporation, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde PLC Inc, Arkema Inc, Ofc. John Doe, Archroma Management LLC, Ratheon Technologies Corporation, ACG Chemicals Americas Inc, Johnson Controls International plc, AGC Inc and Asahi Glass Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2021cv01649
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to AGC Inc, Archroma Management LLC, Chubb Fire LTD, Dynax Corporation. (sshe, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of City of Galesburg(Summy, Scott) Refiled by clerk to correct filing error as notified by filing user Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(sshe, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren D Sumich on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Sumich, Darren)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Fortunato on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Fortunato, Jody)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Cossich, Christina)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Parsiola on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Parsiola, David)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Smith, Luana)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Cossich, Philip)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of City of Galesburg Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01649-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Central, 4:21-cv-04094, City of Galesburg v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1649-RMG (sshe, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 4:21-cv-04094. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the District of South Carolina. This case is terminated. (TK) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-55) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ILC/4:21-cv-04094, 1009 in MDL No. 2873) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/2/2021.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2873, ILC/4:21-cv-04094 (TF) (TK) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]
June 3, 2021 MDL Remark: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) Finalized on 6/2/21. Please see pleading (3 in ILC/4:21-cv-04094, 1016 in MDL No. 2873).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. South Carolina for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/2/2021.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2873, ILC/4:21-cv-04094 (TF) (TK) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number 14626040675. (JS) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by 3M Company. (Bulger, Richard) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Knox County Ninth Judicial District, case number CC 21-LL-0017 ( Filing fee $ 402 ), filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal by E.I. Dupont de Nemours and Co., #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal by The Chemours Co. and The Chemours Co. FC, LLC, #5 Exhibit D - Consent to Removal by Dupont de Nemours, Inc., #6 Exhibit E - Consent to Removal by Corteva, Inc., #7 Exhibit F - Consent to Removal by Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Exhibit G - Consent to Removal by Central Sprinkler LLC, #9 Exhibit H - Consent to Removal by Fire Products GP Holding LLC, #10 Exhibit I - Consent to Removal by Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde Fenwel Inc, Carrier Global Corp, Raytheon Technologies Corp UTC, Fire & Securities Americas Corp Inc, and Chubb Fire LTD, #11 Exhibit J - Consent to Removal by National Foam & Angus Int'l Safety Group, #12 Exhibit K - Consent to Removal by Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., #13 Exhibit L - Consent to Removal by Arkema Inc., #14 Exhibit M - Consent to Removal by BASF Corp., #15 Exhibit N - Consent to Removal by Chemdesign Products, Inc., #16 Exhibit O - Consent to Removal by Dynax, #17 Exhibit P - Consent to Removal by Clariant Corp., #18 Exhibit Q - Consent to Removal by Chemicals Inc., #19 Exhibit R - Consent to Removal by Nation Ford Chemical Co., #20 Exhibit S - Consent to Removal by AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., #21 Exhibit T - Consent to Removal by Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., #22 Exhibit U - Consent to Removal by Archoma U.S., Inc. )(Bulger, Richard) Modified on 5/18/2021 to add document descriptions (JRK). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 6/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Galesburg v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Represented By: Kirk G Warner
Represented By: Addie K S Ries
Represented By: Clifton L Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Represented By: Kurt D Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Brian D Straw
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc
Represented By: Jonathan B Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca M Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Richard F Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Represented By: Scott L Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group LTD
Represented By: Brian D Straw
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler LLC
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Represented By: Oliver E Twaddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Represented By: Ethan Robert Ware
Represented By: Ruth Ann Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca M Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Michael L Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc
Represented By: Daniel A Spira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratheon Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACG Chemicals Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Inc
Represented By: Scott L Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asahi Glass Co Ltd
Represented By: Scott L Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Galesburg
Represented By: Ann Tutoky Harper
Represented By: Brandon J Taylor
Represented By: Christina Cossich
Represented By: Darren D Sumich
Represented By: David A Parsiola
Represented By: Jody Fortunato
Represented By: Luana N Smith
Represented By: Philip F Cossich
Represented By: Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?