Bushey et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Yanbin Bao and Richard Raymond Bushey
Defendant: Caitlin Wegrzyn, Merrick Garland, Tracy Renaud and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 2:2021cv01675
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Raymond Bushey, Yanbin Bao. Merrick Garland served on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Caitlin Wegrzyn served on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Jordan on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Caitlin Wegrzyn (Jordan, William)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER(s) 3,4,5,6,7 Reason: Clerk issued corrected summons(es) as to defendant party, US Attorney, US Attorney General Corrected Filing Document Number #9 (sshe, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Caitlin Wegrzyn. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (vdru, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yanbin Bao, Richard Raymond Bushey.(vdru, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Caitlin Wegrzyn ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9886587.), filed by Richard Raymond Bushey, Yanbin Bao. Service due by 9/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EOIR-29 Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit B: I-130 Denial Notice, #3 Exhibit C: I-485 Denial Notice, #4 Exhibit D: Inquiry Letter to USCIS Charleston Field Office September 2019, #5 Exhibit E: USCIS Inquiry Response May 2020, #6 Exhibit F: USCIS Case Status Update, #7 Exhibit G: USCIS Inquiry Response June 2020, #8 Exhibit H: Responses from Susie Hudson, Office of Congressman Tom Rice (SC-07))(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushey et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin Wegrzyn
Represented By: William H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: William H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: William H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: William H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanbin Bao
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Raymond Bushey
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?