Jeffries et al v. Chemguard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Jeffries and Bryan Jeffries
Defendant: Matlick Enterprises Incorporated, L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP, Perimeter Solutions LP and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01702
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 2:21-cv-00059, Jeffries et al v. Chemguard Incorporated et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-01702-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 18, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4(Buckeye Project Files), 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 10.A, 11.A, 13.A, 18.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:21-cv-00059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 8, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER - Transferring Case to District of South Carolina Re MDL-2873. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of South Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court will construe Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Remand (Doc. #18 ) as a notice of supplemental authority and take no further action at this time. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 5/25/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Chemguard Incorporated, L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated, Matlick Enterprises Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burge, Jason) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Stay ACTION PENDING FINAL TRANSFER DECISION BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) filed by Chemguard Incorporated, L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Stay ACTION PENDING FINAL TRANSFER DECISION BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) filed by Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. (Burge, Jason) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burge, Jason) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matlick Enterprises Incorporated. (Briggs, Sharon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Angela Briggs on behalf of Matlick Enterprises Incorporated. (Briggs, Sharon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay ACTION PENDING FINAL TRANSFER DECISION BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) by Chemguard Incorporated, L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chemguard Incorporated, L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated, Perimeter Solutions LP, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Exhibit 10-15)(Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Danielle Christine Teutonico on behalf of Plaintiffs Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burge, Jason) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kerry James Miller, Jason Walker Burge on behalf of Plaintiffs Bryan Jeffries, Lynn Jeffries. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorneys Danielle Christine Teutonico, Jason Walker Burge, and Kerry James Miller terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Thurlow on behalf of Perimeter Solutions LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint(Doc. #7 ). The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended. (See the attached order for complete details.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly file a status report within two (2) business days of any ruling by the JPML that would impact this case. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/20/2021. (RMW) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (FIRST REQUEST) by Chemguard Incorporated, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landolt, Lukas) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew David Thurlow on behalf of Defendant Perimeter Solutions LP. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Case reassigned to Judge Michael T Liburdi by random lot. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-21-00059-PHX-MTL. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/14/21. (DXD) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19056918. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-59-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products LP. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard Incorporated. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-015377. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19056918 filed by Chemguard Incorporated and Tyco Fire Products LP. (Landolt, Lukas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Affidavit Verification- Lukas Landolt)(MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]
January 13, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Acceptance of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Arbitration upon Perimeter Solutions LP on 12/14/20. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/17/2020.) Acceptance of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Arbitration upon Matlick Enterprises Inc. on 12/10/20. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/10/2020.)(MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. [Transferred from Arizona on 6/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries et al v. Chemguard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matlick Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Sharon Angela Briggs
Represented By: Mitchell J Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.N. Curtis and Sons Incorporated
Represented By: Jill J Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Solutions LP
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Represented By: Lukas Mark Landolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Jeffries
Represented By: Jason Walker Burge
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder, IV
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder
Represented By: Danielle Christine Teutonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Jeffries
Represented By: Jason Walker Burge
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder, IV
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder
Represented By: Danielle Christine Teutonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?