Fultz v. Brothers Property Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Defendant: Brothers Property Management Corporation, Patriots Annex LLC and Patriots Point Development Authority
Case Number: 2:2021cv01863
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice (Not Case Ending) by Patriots Annex LLC. (Brown, Stephanie)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Brothers Property Management Corporation. (vdru, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/13/2021. (vdru, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/3/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/17/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 8/17/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/7/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/8/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2021, Discovery due by 1/7/2022, Motions due by 2/7/2022, Trial Deadline 5/9/2022, Mediation Due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/13/2021. (vdru, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patriots Point Development Authority.(Hagood, H)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Patriots Point Development Authority.(Hagood, H)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, by H Brewton Hagood on behalf of Patriots Point Development Authority (Hagood, H)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Patriots Annex LLC. (vdru, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patriots Annex LLC.(vdru, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-1571. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9912512), filed by Patriots Annex LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents). (vdru, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/22/2021) (vdru, ). Modified on 6/22/2021 to replace main document with the correct document as provided by the filer. (vdru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultz v. Brothers Property Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Property Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriots Annex LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Paige Brown
Represented By: Graham P Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriots Point Development Authority
Represented By: H Brewton Hagood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Represented By: Anthony J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?