Leagans v. LeMaitre Vascular Inc
Plaintiff: Lawrence Leagans
Defendant: LeMaitre Vascular Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01866
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiff shall have until August 19, 2021 to file a reply in support his motion to advance declaratory judgment and for speedy hearing. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/11/2021.(hcor, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and for a Speedy Hearing by Lawrence Leagans. Response to Motion due by 8/24/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Foster, William)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and for a Speedy Hearing Response filed by LeMaitre Vascular Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/12/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Employee Obligations Agreement)(Satterfield, Andreas)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and for a Speedy Hearing. Defendant shall have until August 5, 2021 to file a response. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 07/29/2021.(hcor, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and for a Speedy Hearing by LeMaitre Vascular Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Satterfield, Andreas)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2021 11:00 AM before Honorable David C Norton re #6 Motion to Dismiss and #8 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Call-in instructions will be distributed at a later date. (hcor, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint. Reply filed by LeMaitre Vascular Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Andreas Satterfield)(hcor, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and for a Speedy Hearing by Lawrence Leagans. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Foster, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2021: #1 Exhibit A-Emails, #2 Exhibit B-Agreement) (cmur, ).
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint Response filed by Lawrence Leagans. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/22/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 5-6 2021 Emails, #2 Exhibit B - June 29 and July 26 Emails)(Foster, William) Modified docket text to add exhibit descriptions provided by filing user on 7/16/2021 (hcor, ).
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint by LeMaitre Vascular Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Satterfield, Andreas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Leagans. LeMaitre Vascular Inc served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Refiled to correct event type and to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user.(jbry, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LeMaitre Vascular Inc. (jbry, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lawrence Leagans.(jbry, ) (jbry, ).
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LeMaitre Vascular Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9912660.), filed by Lawrence Leagans. Service due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LeMaitre Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence from LeMaitre counsel)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leagans v. LeMaitre Vascular Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeMaitre Vascular Inc
Represented By: Andreas Neal Satterfield, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Leagans
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?