Baker Roofing Company v. Aboytes Commercial Roofing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Baker Roofing Company
Defendant: Aboytes Commercial Roofing LLC and Armando Aboytes
Case Number: 2:2021cv02073
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. (Culbreath, Gray)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. (Culbreath, Gray)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Baker Roofing Company. Armando Aboytes served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Green Card)(Culbreath, Gray)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Baker Roofing Company. Aboytes Commercial Roofing LLC served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Green Card)(Culbreath, Gray)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Baker Roofing Company.(jbry, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Baker Roofing Company.(jbry, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9954972.), filed by Baker Roofing Company. Service due by 10/12/2021(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker Roofing Company v. Aboytes Commercial Roofing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Roofing Company
Represented By: Gray Thomas Culbreath
Represented By: Kyle David McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aboytes Commercial Roofing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Aboytes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?