Bryant v. State Farm Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Bryant
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies
Case Number: 2:2021cv02956
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (cpeg, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (dgar)
October 20, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (dgar)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony G. Bryant. The court grants leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (hcor, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (hcor, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION by Anthony G. Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(cpeg, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 RE-ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #8 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (hcor, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (hcor, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 RECORD REQUEST of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony G. Bryant. (hcor, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #8 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (hcor, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Anthony G. Bryant 2123 Courtland Avenue Charleston, SC 29403 (hcor, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #8 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (hcor, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Anthony G. Bryant. - Filing fee $ 505. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hcor, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (hcor, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (hcor, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by Anthony Bryant. (hcor, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anthony G. Bryant. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hcor, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Insurance Companies, filed by Anthony G. Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. State Farm Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?