Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Fish This LLC et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Fish This LLC and Delana I Rast
Case Number: 2:2021cv03061
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Fish This, LLC and Delana I. Rast by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Mason letter serving S&C, #2 Exhibit B-Auto Owners NOA and Conditional Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Auto-Owners Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit D-Policy of Insurance)No proposed order.(Templeton, Morgan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Fish This, LLC and Delana I. Rast. (vdru, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Clerk byAuto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Templeton, Morgan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Delana I Rast served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Templeton, Morgan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Fish This LLC served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Templeton, Morgan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fish This LLC, Delana I Rast. (vdru, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company.(vdru, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fish This LLC, Delana I Rast ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10087298.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Service due by 12/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Fish This LLC policy, #2 Exhibit B: Delana Rast policy, #3 State Court Documents).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Fish This LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Morgan S Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Morgan S Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish This LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delana I Rast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?