Fultz v. Brick LLC, The
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Defendant: Brick LLC, The
Case Number: 2:2021cv03140
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Brick LLC, The.(Foster, William)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The Brick LLC answer deadline extended to 10/25/2021. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/30/2021.(vdru, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brick LLC, The. Response to Motion due by 10/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Towery, Katie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brick LLC, The.(vdru, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-03632. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10095195), filed by Brick LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultz v. Brick LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Represented By: Anthony J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brick LLC, The
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Towery
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?