Rivers v. Warden, FCI Williamsburg
Petitioner: Kenneth Leon Rivers
Respondent: Warden, FCI Williamsburg
Case Number: 2:2021cv03154
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00 paid, receipt number SCX300096091 (dgar)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order and AO-240 placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Kenneth Leon Rivers 42880-004 FCI WIlliamsburg PO Box 340 Salters, SC 29590 (dgar)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/25/2021. (dgar)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth Leon Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Supporting Facts, #2 Envelope)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Warden, FCI Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Leon Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?