Fultz v. SSW LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Defendant: SSW LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03209
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDERMotions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/14/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/11/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/16/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/23/2022, Discovery due by 7/11/2022, Motions due by 8/15/2022, Trial Deadline 10/22/2022, Mediation Due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/29/2021. (vdru, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SSW LLC.(Osborne, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by SSW LLC.(Osborne, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by SSW LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osborne, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/12/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/18/2021. (vdru, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/8/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/22/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 11/22/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/13/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/12/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/11/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/11/2022, Discovery due by 4/12/2022, Motions due by 5/12/2022, Trial Deadline 8/2/2022, Mediation Due by 4/12/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/18/2021. (vdru, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by SSW LLC.(Dunlap, Jennifer)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Dunlap, Jennifer)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSW LLC.(vdru, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-03894. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10105651), filed by SSW LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultz v. SSW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Represented By: Anthony J Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSW LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Kirk Dunlap
Represented By: Robert Crum Osborne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?