XL Speciality Insurance Company v. Hughs
Plaintiff: XL Speciality Insurance Company
Defendant: Brian Hughs
Case Number: 2:2021cv03254
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brian Hughs.(Allen, Christy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Abstain or Stay by Brian Hughs. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- XL Specialty Policy, #2 Exhibit 2- Delaware Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Delaware 1st Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4- Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay, #5 Exhibit 5- Delaware Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Allen, Christy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Brian Hughs answer due 11/30/2021. (Allen, Christy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy Ford Allen on behalf of Brian Hughs (Allen, Christy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XL Speciality Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Lay, John)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brian Hughs. (hcor, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by XL Speciality Insurance Company.(hcor, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Hughs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10110910.), filed by XL Speciality Insurance Company. Service due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XL Speciality Insurance Company v. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: John T Lay
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hughs
Represented By: Christy Ford Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?