O'Bryant v. Flowers Foods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles O'Bryant and Lee Parker
Defendant: Flowers Foods Inc and Derst Baking Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03501
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF JOINDER of Lee Parker by Marybeth E Mullaney on behalf of Charles O'Bryant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(Mullaney, Marybeth)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Oliver Eckard on behalf of Derst Baking Company LLC, Flowers Foods Inc (Eckard, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time: The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 1/28/2022. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/29/2021.(vdru, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Derst Baking Company LLC, Flowers Foods Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McMahon, Michelle)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Flowers Foods Inc. (vdru, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Derst Baking Company LLC. (vdru, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles O'Bryant.(vdru, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10147786.), filed by Charles O'Bryant. Service due by 1/24/2022.(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Bryant v. Flowers Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles O'Bryant
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Parker
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods Inc
Represented By: Michael Oliver Eckard
Represented By: Michelle Elsey McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derst Baking Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Oliver Eckard
Represented By: Michelle Elsey McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?