Anderson v. Nason Care LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Anderson
Defendant: Nason Care LLC and Barron S. Nason
Case Number: 2:2021cv04132
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/7/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/21/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 3/21/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/16/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/14/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/14/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/21/2022, Discovery due by 8/15/2022, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 8/29/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 1/3/2023 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/14/2022. (sshe, )
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barron S. Nason, Nason Care LLC.(Cobb, Hal) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/14/2022) (sshe, ). Modified on 2/14/2022 to replace with corrected signature document as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Barron S. Nason, Nason Care LLC.(Cobb, Hal) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/14/2022) (sshe, ). Modified on 2/14/2022 to replace with corrected signature document as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wendy Anderson. Service due by 4/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Mullaney, Marybeth)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barron S. Nason, Nason Care LLC. (hcor, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wendy Anderson.(hcor, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barron S. Nason, Nason Care LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10251102.), filed by Wendy Anderson. Service due by 3/22/2022(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Nason Care LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Anderson
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nason Care LLC
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Stefanie L Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron S. Nason
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Stefanie L Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?