Marin v. Wilson
Petitioner: Manuel A Marin
Respondent: Alan Wilson and Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2022cv00351
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order 2241 SCDC Service, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Manuel A Marin 343371 Lieber Correctional Institution P.O. Box 205 Ridgeville, SC 29472. (dgar)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(dgar) Modified on 2/28/2022 to edit docket text(dgar).
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 Letter from Manuel A. Marin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300097738 (dgar)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Manuel A Marin 343371 Lieber Correctional Institution P.O. Box 205 Ridgeville, SC 29472. (dgar)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/8/2022. (dgar)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Manuel A Marin. (Attachments: #1 cover letters, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marin v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel A Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Lieber Correctional Institution
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?