Shannon v. Laird et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kennedy Shannon
Defendant: C. Michael Laird, Brandan McSheehy, David Leslie, Chris Oksala, Sean McMicking, James Duffy, Jake Grill, Rearny Vann, Jonathan Hoff, Rod Rape and Chauncy Solomon
Case Number: 2:2022cv04318
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Kennedy Shannon. Response filed by Kenneth Kennedy Shannon. Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak)
January 5, 2023 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kenneth Kennedy Shannon, 13622-016, U.S.P. Lee, P.O. Box 305, Jonesville, VA 24263. (lbak)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this matter be summarily dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/4/2023. (lbak)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/4/2023. (lbak)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kenneth Kennedy Shannon. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, one blank summons, one blank AO-240 form, twelve blank USM forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kenneth Kennedy Shannon, 13622-016, U.S.P. Lee, P.O. Box 30,5 Jonesville, VA 24263. (dist)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/12/2022. (dist)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 3 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kenneth Kennedy Shannon 13622-016 U.S.P. Lee P.O. Box 305 Jonesville, VA 24263 (bshr, )
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges. Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Duffy, Jake Grill, Jonathan Hoff, C. Michael Laird, David Leslie, Sean McMicking, Brandan McSheehy, Chris Oksala, Rod Rape, Chauncy Solomon, Rearny Vann, filed by Kenneth Kennedy Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Laird et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kennedy Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Michael Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandan McSheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oksala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McMicking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rearny Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Rape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chauncy Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?