Sundog Sailing LLC v. Black et al
Plaintiff: Sundog Sailing LLC
Defendant: Anthony Black, Marine Propulsion Inc and Rockville Marine Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv04265
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/31/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/14/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 11/14/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/7/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/8/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/15/2024, Discovery due by 4/8/2024, Motions due by 4/22/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 9/3/2024, Motions in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/10/2023. (gray)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by Sundog Sailing LLC.(Bowen, John)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 Defendants' Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anthony Black, Marine Propulsion Inc, Rockville Marine Inc.(Buckley, Edward)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sundog Sailing LLC by Marine Propulsion Inc, Anthony Black, Rockville Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Buckley, Edward)
August 31, 2023 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Sundog Sailing LLC. All Defendants. (Bowen, John)
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (gray)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sundog Sailing LLC. (gray)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11286478), filed by Sundog Sailing LLC. Service due by 11/27/2023. (gray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundog Sailing LLC v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundog Sailing LLC
Represented By: John Rhett Crosswell Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Black
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Propulsion Inc
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockville Marine Inc
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?