Might Be Hungover, LLC v. Koch et al
Plaintiff: Might Be Hungover, LLC d/b/a Elxr Holdings, LLC
Defendant: NewCo, Glomaco, LLC, TW International Investments, Ltd., TW Diversified Holdings, LLC, TW Funds, Inc., David Matuschewski, Michael Rose & Associates Strategic Consulting, Inc., Bottoms Up Brands, LLC and Rodney Koch
Case Number: 2:2024cv05099
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/7/2024.(eric, )
September 30, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for issuance of Subpoena Motion for Leave to Send Subpoenas by Might Be Hungover, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Alex Partner, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Scott Wilfong, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Jameson Jenkins, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Just Meats)No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
September 13, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bottoms Up Brands, LLC, Glomaco, LLC, Rodney Koch, David Matuschewski, Michael Rose & Associates Strategic Consulting, Inc., NewCo, TW Diversified Holdings, LLC, TW Funds, Inc., TW International Investments, Ltd.. (hcor, )
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Might Be Hungover, LLC.(hcor, )
September 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bottoms Up Brands, LLC, Glomaco, LLC, Rodney Koch, David Matuschewski, Michael Rose & Associates Strategic Consulting, Inc., NewCo, TW Diversified Holdings, LLC, TW Funds, Inc., TW International Investments, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11991763.), filed by Might Be Hungover, LLC. Service due by 12/12/2024 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Might Be Hungover, LLC v. Koch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewCo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glomaco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TW International Investments, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TW Diversified Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TW Funds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Matuschewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rose & Associates Strategic Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottoms Up Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Might Be Hungover, LLC d/b/a Elxr Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jesse Ronald Jones, Jr
Represented By: Barrett R Brewer
Represented By: Amanda Davis McKendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?