Ridgeview Manor of the Midlands LP et al v. Leavitt et al
Plaintiff: Sterling Healthcare Inc, Cimerron Properties Inc and Ridgeview Manor of the Midlands LP
Defendant: Michael O Leavitt, Leslie V Norwalk, Esq and Robert M Kerr
Case Number: 3:2007cv00861
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Joseph F Anderson Jr on 04/09/2007. (shod, )
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Joseph F Anderson Jr on 04/05/2007. (shod, )
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Joseph F Anderson Jr on 3/30/07.(shod, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridgeview Manor of the Midlands LP et al v. Leavitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O Leavitt
Represented By: Jennifer J Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie V Norwalk, Esq
Represented By: Howard Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Amy Harmon Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimerron Properties Inc
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgeview Manor of the Midlands LP
Represented By: Amy Harmon Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?