Robinson v. McHugh
Plaintiff: Willie Earl Robinson
Defendant: John M McHugh
Case Number: 3:2012cv01146
Filed: April 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by John M McHugh, 62 Report and Recommendation, Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on June 23, 2014. (kbos)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John M McHugh. Plaintiff has failed to respond to the motion. As such, it appears to the court that he does not oppose the motion and wishes to abandon this actio n. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by January 23, 2014. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 1/9/2014. (abuc)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting 19 Report and Recommendation, denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Payment of Fees and Affidavit 2 . The case is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for additional pretrial handling. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 8/31/2012. (abuc)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/6/2012. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Earl Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?