Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc v. Ahepa National Housing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc
Defendant: Ahepa National Housing Corporation, Ahepa Affordable Housing Management Co Inc, Ahepa 284 IV Inc, Ahepa 284 III Inc and Ahepa 242 Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00354
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting in part 122 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, directing defendants to pay Crawford & Company the amount of $15,000.00. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 07/01/2014. (bshr, )
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re 100 Defendant's Motion to Compel production of certain documents inpossession of Plaintiff and a third party. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 06/25/2014. (bshr, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 120 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 05/06/2014.(bshr, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings As to Defedants' Counterclaim, and directing parties to resume with discovery. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/10/2013.(bshr, )
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER transferring case to the District of South Carolina; defendants 8 Motion to dismiss or transfer is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 2/8/13. (mc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc v. Ahepa National Housing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahepa National Housing Corporation
Represented By: Scott S Morrisson
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahepa Affordable Housing Management Co Inc
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Scott S Morrisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahepa 284 IV Inc
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: Scott S Morrisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahepa 284 III Inc
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: Scott S Morrisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahepa 242 Inc
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: Scott S Morrisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey I Young
Represented By: Logan McCombs Wells
Represented By: Jeffrey Siderius
Represented By: Peter Harris Dworjanyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?