AllSouth Federal Credit Union v. Does et al

Defendant: John Does and Jane Does
Plaintiff: AllSouth Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2013cv01035
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS granting 14 Motion for Disclosure/for Court Order Requiring Production of Documents. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 08/05/2013.(bshr, )
July 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS granting 12 Motion for Disclosure of Documents. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/30/2013.(bshr, )
June 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS granting 8 MOTION for Court Order Requiring Production of Documents. Signed by the Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 06/03/2013. (bshr, )
May 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS granting 8 MOTION for Court Order Requiring Production of Documents. Signed by the Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 05/29/2013.(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AllSouth Federal Credit Union v. Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AllSouth Federal Credit Union
Represented By: John C McElwaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?