Stockton v. Shaw Industries Group Inc
Plaintiff: Laura C Stockton
Defendant: Shaw Industries Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv01904
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER directing the parties to inform the court in writing of the status of this case on or before December 27, 2016 and advise the court as to whether the case is ready for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/20/2016. (bgoo)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ACCEPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denies 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Shaw Industries Group Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 12/3/2015. (gmil)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting defendant's motion to dismiss, this action is dismissed without prejudice. The court hereby grants plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 15 days, for 12 Report and Recommendation, 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shaw Industries Group Inc, ( Specific Document due by 2/17/2015.) Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on February 2, 2015. (kbos)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockton v. Shaw Industries Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura C Stockton
Represented By: Nancy Alecusan Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Industries Group Inc
Represented By: Reginald W Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?