New Horizons Franchising Group Inc v. Cooke & Moses LLC et al

Plaintiff: New Horizons Franchising Group Inc
Defendant: Cooke & Moses LLC, The Green Owl LLC, Roy Lee Cooke, Betty Cooke, Jeffrey H Moses and Larraine L Moses
Case Number: 3:2014cv03333
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of New Horizons Franchising Group Inc against Roy Lee Cooke in the amount of $404,272.72. Postjudgment interest shall run at a rate of 0.33%. (asni, )
June 30, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying without prejudice 21 Motion for TRO; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/29/2015.(asni, )
June 4, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Default Judgment as to Roy Lee Cooke, individually and Representative of the Estate of Betty Beach Cooke. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/4/2015.(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Horizons Franchising Group Inc v. Cooke & Moses LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Horizons Franchising Group Inc
Represented By: Robert Alan Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooke & Moses LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Owl LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Lee Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey H Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larraine L Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?