Funderburk et al v. South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
Plaintiff: Sharon Funderburk and Thomas Funderburk
Defendant: South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04660
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part (166) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv- 04888-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting in part(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granti ng in part (148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting in part (149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting in part (151) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting in part (150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting in part (128) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting in part (144) Motion for Summ ary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; granting in part (153) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; granting in part (144) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC. The court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdicti on over Plaintiffs' remaining state law claims for negligence and trespass. The court REMANDS Plaintiffs' claims of negligence and trespass to the Lexington County Court of Common Pleas for further proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order of remand to the Clerk of Court of the Lexington County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/1/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER AND OPINION granting(165) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; g ranting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting(147) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granting(148) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting(148) Moti on for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting(150) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting(149) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting(143) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; granting(143) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/26/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER AND OPINION denying (171) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04695-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15- cv-04893-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; denying (153) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; denying (154) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; denying (156) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; denying (155) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; denying (132) Motion to Remand in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; denying (149) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01141-JMC; denying (158) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; denying (149) Motion to Remand in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/14/2019.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT STIPULATION ESTABLISHING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL AND ORDER Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/19/2017. Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting (39) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting (27) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04694-JMC; granting (27) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04695- JMC; granting (26) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04877-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04887-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04888-JMC; granting (25) Motio n for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04889-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04890-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04891-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Ord er in case 3:15-cv-04892-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04893-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04894-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04895- JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04896-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04897-JMC; granting (25) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04898-JMC; granting (25) Motio n for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04899-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04920-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04922-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Ord er in case 3:15-cv-04923-JMC; granting (24) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04924-JMC; granting (31) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01141- JMC; granting (28) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC; granting (19) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01143-JMC; granting (17) Motion for Confidentiality Order in case 3:16-cv-01144-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/1/2016.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC et al.(asni, )
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting (20) Motion to Consolidate Cases for in case 3:15-cv-04660-JMC; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:15-cv-04926-JMC; granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-01142-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/9/2016.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-04660-JMC, 3:15-cv-04926-JMC, 3:16-cv-01142-JMC(asni, )
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AND OPINION denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 18 Motion for Certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/27/2016.(asni, )
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND OPINION denying 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/15/2016.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funderburk et al v. South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Funderburk
Represented By: Stephen Jahue Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Funderburk
Represented By: Stephen Jahue Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
Represented By: ElizabethAnn Loadholt Carroll
Represented By: Tracey Colton Green
Represented By: Mitchell Myron Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?