Samadi v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Mike H Samadi
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2016cv00562
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Mike H. Samadi and with prejudice as to Helen Samadi. (abuc)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 79 Report and Recommendation and granting Defendant's 61 motion to dismiss as to Mike Samadi. The matter is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for additional pretrial handling. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 1/30/2018. (bgoo)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 36 Report and Recommendation, as supplemented and clarified in the 45 Supplemental Report and Recommendation, granting the Defendant's 23 motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's clai ms regarding his 2002, 2003, and 2004 tax refunds, denying the Defendant's 23 motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's claims regarding his 2008 tax refund, and recommitting the matter to the Magistrate Judge for additional pretrial handling. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 1/18/2017. (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samadi v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike H Samadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?