ADESSO Homeowners Association et al v. Holder Properties Inc et al
Plaintiff: ADESSO Homeowners Association, Emad Tadros, Sam Vause, Jr, William Durkin and ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime
Defendant: Winston Steel LLC, Ace Glass Company Inc, Hester Drywall Inc, Flooring Services Inc, Southern Fireproofing Company Inc, Southern Vistas Inc, Jamco Doors, Holder Adesso LLC, SRS Concrete Finishing, Capitol City Custom Iron Works and Fence LLC, John R Holder, Jr, ADESSO Columbia LLC, Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc, Holder Properties Inc, Holland Roofing Inc, JRH Adesso LLC, STO Corp, Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc, Drake Adesso LLC, Structural Preservation Systems LLC, Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC, Key Construction Inc, Dryvit Systems Inc, Advanced Door Systems Inc, Gill Plumbing Company, Fernandez Contractors International Inc, SDI Solutions LLC, Niles Bolton Associates Inc, JRH LLC, Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc, JR Hobbs Co, GrayStone of Florida Inc, Reliance Interiors Inc, Taylor Brothers Construction Company Inc, Andersen Windows Inc, Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated, All-South Electrical Constructors Inc, Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc, Browder and LeGuizamon and Associates Inc, Meza Isidro, Towers Paint Contractors Inc and Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Capital Group, LLC and Benito Galicia
Cross Defendant: Will Whitaker
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Commercial Building Services Inc and Artistic Enterprises Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00710
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Filing 518 AFFIDAVIT of Jared H. Garraux of Completion of Disbursement of Class Action Settlement Funds by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Garraux, Jared)
October 19, 2017 Filing 517 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Smith, Franklin)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re #478 Order Certifying Settlement Class and Preliminary Approving Settlement. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/6/17. (mflo, )
July 5, 2017 Filing 514 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Service of Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement by Jared Hudson Garraux on behalf of ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime (Garraux, Jared)
June 6, 2017 Filing 513 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005, CORRECTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Attorney General for United States, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Attorney Generals)(Norton, Erik)
June 6, 2017 Filing 512 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 489 Reason: duplicate filing to correct signature of filer; Corrected Filing Document Number #502 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 6/2/17 (mflo, )
June 5, 2017 Filing 511 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Structural Preservation Systems LLC Regarding Service of Notices Required By The Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - SPS ltr to US Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - SPS ltr to SC LLR, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - SPS ltr to CA Attorney General)(Parker, Theodore) (Main Document 511 replaced document with corrected signature as provided by filing user on 6/6/2017) (mflo, ).
June 5, 2017 Filing 510 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Drew, Ellis)
June 5, 2017 Filing 509 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Niles Bolton Associates Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to SC LLR)(Winton, Tyler)
June 5, 2017 Filing 508 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fernandez Contractors International Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCants, John)
June 5, 2017 Filing 507 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Artistic Enterprises Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCants, John)
June 5, 2017 Filing 506 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Teague, Carl)
June 5, 2017 Filing 505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Towers Paint Contractors Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to NC Licensing Board, #2 Exhibit Letter to NC Dept of Justice)(Cox, James)
June 5, 2017 Filing 504 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ace Glass Company Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Bruton, John)
June 5, 2017 Filing 503 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc Regarding Notices Required By The Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hollingsworth, Dunn)
June 5, 2017 Filing 501 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr to US Atty General, #2 Exhibit Ltr to SCDLLR, #3 Exhibit Ltr to CA Atty General, #4 Exhibit Ltr to FL State Board, #5 Exhibit Ltr to Illinois State Board, #6 Exhibit Ltr to Louisiana State Board, #7 Exhibit Ltr to Michigan State Board, #8 Exhibit Ltr to NJ State Board, #9 Exhibit Ltr to NC State Board, #10 Exhibit Ltr to PA State Board, #11 Exhibit Ltr to TN State Board, #12 Exhibit Ltr to TX State Board, #13 Exhibit Ltr to MD State Board)(Wilkes, Michael)
June 5, 2017 Filing 500 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GrayStone of Florida Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A letters to the Attorney General for the various states, #2 Exhibit B is the address list for all Class Members)(Boyd, Brent) Modified on 6/8/2017 to add exhibit descriptions as provided by filing user (mflo, ).
June 2, 2017 Filing 502 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flooring Services Inc Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Exhibit A)(Kearney, Lauren) (Main Document 502 replaced on 6/5/2017 with corrected signature as provided by filing user) (mflo, ). Modified on 6/6/2017 to correct filing date (mflo, ).
June 2, 2017 Filing 499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters to State Regulatory and Supervisory Authorities)(McCue, Joey)
June 2, 2017 Filing 498 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holland Roofing Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters to State Regulatory and Supervisory Authorities)(McCue, Joey) (Main Document 498 replaced on 6/5/2017 as provided by filing user to correct typographical error) (mflo, ).
June 2, 2017 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters to State Regulatory and Supervisory Authorities)(McCue, Joey)
June 2, 2017 Filing 496 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Notice Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 by Robert Thomas Strickland on behalf of Commercial Building Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to South Carolina Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Letter to SC LLR, #3 Exhibit Letters to State Regulatory and Supervisory Authorities)(Strickland, Robert)
June 2, 2017 Filing 495 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STO Corp (Newberry, Derek)
June 2, 2017 Filing 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dryvit Systems Inc re #482 Certificate of Service, Regarding Service of Notices Required by Class Action Fairness Act (Trautman, M Caroline)
June 2, 2017 Filing 493 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Key Construction Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Attorney General Sessions)(Howser, R)
June 2, 2017 Filing 492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Advanced Door Systems Inc re #478 Order, Terminate Motions,,,, (Boineau, Robert)
June 2, 2017 Filing 491 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hester Drywall Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letter to SC LLR)(Shaw, Joshua)
June 2, 2017 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 re #482 (Richardson, Andrew) Modified on 6/5/2017 to link to associated filing(mflo, ).
June 2, 2017 Filing 488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reliance Interiors Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter State Construction Industry Licensing Board)(Mahon, Christy)
June 2, 2017 Filing 487 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gill Plumbing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter to SC LLR)(Mahon, Christy)
June 2, 2017 Filing 486 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southern Vistas Inc re #482 Certificate of Service, (Stubbs, Sidney)
June 1, 2017 Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to SC LLR)(Richardson, Andrew)
June 1, 2017 Filing 484 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Notice Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 by Robert Mills Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Capital Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice to SC Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation)(Kennedy, Robert)
June 1, 2017 Filing 483 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JR Hobbs Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A NC State Board of Examiners , #2 Exhibit B Letter to SC Department of Labor)(Hollingsworth, Dunn) Modified on 6/2/2017 to add exhibit descriptions (mflo, ).
June 1, 2017 Filing 482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Attorney General for United States, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Attorney Generals)(Norton, Erik)
May 31, 2017 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc, Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to the SC LLR)(Orr, Lawrence)
May 30, 2017 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Notices Required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2015 by Edward Glenn Elliott on behalf of SRS Concrete Finishing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Attorney General for United States, #2 Exhibit Notice to SC Department of Labor Licensing and Regulation, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Attorney Generals)(Elliott, Edward)
May 23, 2017 Filing 479 NOTICE of Fairness Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 9/5/2017 02:30 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, AUTHORIZING CLASS NOTICE AND SCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING; Granting #477 Supplement to #475 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Preliminarily Approve Settlement, Authorize Class Notice and Schedule Fairness Hearing filed by William Durkin. The deadline for putative Class members to opt-out or file an objection to the proposed Class settlement is June 30, 2017. A fairness hearing is scheduled for 2:30 p.m. on September 5, 2017. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/23/17. (mflo, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 477 SUPPLEMENT by William Durkin to #475 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Preliminarily Approve Settlement, Authorize Class Notice and Schedule Fairness Hearing responding to ECF No. 476. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice to Settlement Class, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Certifying Settlement Class and Approving Settlement, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Executed Class Settlement Agreement)(Garraux, Jared)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER the Court is requesting clarification or, if necessary, supplementation regarding eight issues as described in this order, relating to #475 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Preliminarily Approve Settlement, Authorize Class Notice and Schedule Fairness Hearing filed by William Durkin. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/17/17. (mflo, )
May 11, 2017 Filing 475 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Preliminarily Approve Settlement, Authorize Class Notice and Schedule Fairness Hearing by William Durkin. Response to Motion due by 5/25/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Carol Howes, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Leonard Greene, P.E., #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Scott Harvey, AIA, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of William Durkin, #6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Franklin J. Smith, Jr., #7 Exhibit F - Proposed Executed Class Action Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit G - Proposed Notice to Class Members)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Garraux, Jared) See #477 for Supplement (mflo, ).
May 9, 2017 Filing 474 TEXT ORDER granting #473 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Certify Settlement Class filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, ( Motions due by 5/12/2017,). Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/9/17. (mflo, )
May 8, 2017 Filing 473 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Certify Settlement Class by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Response to Motion due by 5/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Garraux, Jared)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER All three settlement agreements and releases shall be executed no later than Friday, May 5, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their motion and proposed consent order regarding class certification and approval of settlement no later than Monday, May 8, 2017. re #470 Status Report filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, ( Motions due by 5/8/2017,). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/25/17. (mflo, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 471 TEXT ORDER On March 15, 2017, the Court was notified that "this case was mediated on February 6, 7, and 8 and March 2, 2017," and "[a]ll claims, cross claims, counterclaims and third and fourth party claims between all parties have now been settled." ECF No. 467. Based upon this representation, the Court DENIES all pending motions to dismiss or for summary judgment without prejudice and with leave to refile as they are deemed moot at this time. finding as moot #345 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andersen Windows Inc; finding as moot #346 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Silver Line Building Products LLC; finding as moot #401 Motion to Dismiss by GrayStone of Florida; finding as moot #431 Motion for Summary Judgment by SRS Concrete Finishing; finding as moot #458 Motion for Summary Judgment by Niles Bolton Associates Inc; finding as moot #459 Motion for Summary Judgment by Niles Bolton Associates Inc; finding as moot #460 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Niles Bolton Associates Inc. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/24/17.(mflo, )
April 21, 2017 Filing 470 STATUS REPORT by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Smith, Franklin)
April 6, 2017 Filing 469 TEXT ORDER Based upon the representation that all claims have been settled (ECF No. 467), the Court orders a status report to be submitted no later than April 21, 2017, which shall state whether or not the appropriate releases have been completed. In addition, the report shall provide the approximate date that the motion and proposed consent order regarding class certification and approval of the settlement will be submitted in this action. re #467 Status Report filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, ( Status Report due by 4/21/2017.) Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/6/17. (mflo, )
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to refile #186 Motion to Strike portions of Key's answer. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/15/17.(mflo, )
March 15, 2017 Filing 467 STATUS REPORT Updated by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Smith, Franklin)
March 10, 2017 Filing 466 STATUS REPORT by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Smith, Franklin)
February 17, 2017 Filing 465 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Tyler Paul Winton for March 6, 2017 through March 15, 2017 (Winton, Tyler)
February 9, 2017 Filing 463 TEXT ORDER Based upon the parties' representation (ECF #462) that mediation has been conducted and the parties are attempting to reach a global settlement, the Court hereby orders an extension of all applicable deadlines for three weeks. Furthermore, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall only work on the issue of settlement during this extension period. re #462 Letter filed by William Durkin, ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, Emad Tadros Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/9/17. (mflo, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 462 Letter by way of email from Frank Smith, attorney for plaintiffs and CC of all other Attorneys in this case. (mflo, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 461 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 448, 449, 450 Reason: refiled to separate and label exhibits; Corrected Filing Document Number #458 , #459 , #460 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 2/3/17 ;Response due date modified to that of original filing: 2/17/2017. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #447 MOTION to Amend/Correct #430 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #230 Scheduling Order filed by ADESSO Columbia LLC. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/3/17. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 456 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SDI Solutions LLC per #446 Request for entry of default. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 455 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Winston Steel LLC per #446 Request for entry of default. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 454 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Capitol City Custom Iron Works and Fence LLC per #446 Request for entry of default. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 453 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Taylor Brothers Construction Company Inc per #446 Request for entry of default. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 452 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fernandez Contractors International Inc per #446 Request for entry of default. (mflo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 451 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 438 and 444 Reason: refiled by filing user with corrected document; Corrected Filing Document Number #446 (mflo, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 460 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment against Holder Properties, Inc. and Key Construction, Inc. by Niles Bolton Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement dated November 1, 2010, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Daniel Meacham)No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) Modified on 2/7/2017 to change date to original filing (mflo, ).
February 3, 2017 Filing 459 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Holder Properties, Inc., Adesso/Columbia, LLC and Key Construction, Inc. by Niles Bolton Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit B - Stafford Field Reports 2008, #4 Exhibit C - Stafford Field Reports 2009, #5 Exhibit D - Letter from Chris Smith to Residents of Adesso, #6 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement dated November 1, 2010, #7 Exhibit F - Adesso Water Problems e-mail)No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) Modified on 2/7/2017 to change date to original filing (mflo, ).
February 3, 2017 Filing 458 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs by Niles Bolton Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit B - Stafford Field Reports 2008, #4 Exhibit C - Stafford Field Reports 2009, #5 Exhibit D - Letter from Chris Smith to Residents of Adesso, #6 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement dated November 1, 2010, #7 Exhibit F - Adesso Water Problems e-mail, #8 Exhibit G - William and Patricia Durkin deposition excerpts)No proposed order.(Stair, Kent) Modified on 2/7/2017 to change date to original filing (mflo, ).
February 3, 2017 Filing 447 MOTION to Amend/Correct #430 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #230 Scheduling Order by ADESSO Columbia LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Norton, Erik)
February 3, 2017 Filing 446 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default - Capitol City Custom Iron Works & Fence, #2 Affidavit of Default - Fernandez Contractors International, #3 Affidavit of Default - SDI Solutions, #4 Affidavit of Default - Taylor Brothers Construction, #5 Affidavit of Default - Winston Steel)(Garraux, Jared)
February 2, 2017 Filing 445 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brent Morris Boyd for March 11, 2017 through March 15, 2017 and May 29, 2017 through June 2, 2017 (Boyd, Brent)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #441 Motion to Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order (CMSO) dated August 23, 2016, (ECF No. 230), as amended (ECF Nos. 368, 397, 426, 430). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/26/17.(mflo, )
January 24, 2017 Filing 441 MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Scheduling Order With Regard to Opposition to Motion to Certify Class by ADESSO Columbia LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Norton, Erik)
January 23, 2017 Filing 440 Withdrawal of Motions: #435 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GrayStone of Florida Inc.. (Walsh, James)
January 23, 2017 Filing 439 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 437 Reason: refiled with the correct event type; Corrected Filing Document Number 438 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 1/20/17. (mflo, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 436 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr for February 27, 2017 through March 3, 2017 and July 3, 2017 through July 7, 2017 (Richardson, Andrew)
January 19, 2017 Filing 435 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GrayStone of Florida Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Walsh, James)
January 17, 2017 Filing 434 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
January 13, 2017 Filing 433 REPLY to Crossclaim #396 by Towers Paint Contractors Inc.(Cox, James) (Main Document 433 replaced on 1/17/2017 with signature of attorney as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
January 13, 2017 Filing 432 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Towers Paint Contractors Inc.(Cox, James) (Main Document 432 replaced on 1/17/2017 with attorney signature as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
January 13, 2017 Filing 431 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SRS Concrete Finishing. Response to Motion due by 1/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Elliott, Edward)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting #427 Motion to Amend #230 Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/12/17.(mflo, ) (Main Document 430 replaced on 1/12/2017) (mflo, ).
January 12, 2017 Filing 429 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Sidney Markey Stubbs for March 23, 2017 - April 3, 2017 (Stubbs, Sidney)
January 9, 2017 Filing 428 REPLY by GrayStone of Florida Inc to #313 Reply to Crossclaim of Holder Properties Inc and Adesso/Columbia LLC. (Walsh, James) Modified on 1/10/2017 to correct link and add text (mflo, ).
January 6, 2017 Filing 427 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Scheduling Order , CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/20/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Horton, Greg) (Main Document 427 replaced on 1/12/2017 as provided by filing user to correct typographical error) (mflo, ).
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER AMENDING #230 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER that Sections 4(b)(v) and 4(b)(vi) of the CMSO are amended as follows: to provide that while one or more lead Defendant(s) must serve pleadings at the times designated, other Defendants may join in and/or supplement such pleadings by serving their own pleadings no later than five (5) business days thereafter. Granting #423 Motion to Amend/Correct the Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/5/17.(mflo, )
January 4, 2017 Filing 424 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by JR Hobbs Co.(Barton, Jillian)
December 30, 2016 Filing 423 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Scheduling Order / Case Management Order by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/13/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Horton, Greg)
December 28, 2016 Filing 422 RESPONSE in Opposition re #401 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/4/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Smith, Franklin)
December 22, 2016 Filing 421 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Greg Horton for February 15 to 21; March 31 to April 3; April 10 to 17; June 6 to 15; and, July 7 to 12, 2017 (Horton, Greg) (Main Document 421 replaced on 12/28/2016 as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
December 22, 2016 Filing 420 REPLY by JR Hobbs Co to #142 Cross-Claims of Key Construction. (Barton, Jillian) Modified on 12/27/2016 to add link(mflo, ).
December 21, 2016 Filing 419 REPLY to Crossclaim #382 of Reliance Interiors by Key Construction Inc.(Howser, R)
December 21, 2016 Filing 418 TEXT ORDER granting #392 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Mark Steven Barrow for Gill Plumbing Company.; granting #416 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Mark Steven Barrow for Gill Plumbing Company. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/21/16.(mflo, )
December 20, 2016 Filing 417 REPLY to Crossclaim #382 by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc.(Norton, Erik) (Main Document 417 replaced on 12/21/2016 as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
December 20, 2016 Filing 416 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gill Plumbing Company. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mahon, Christy) Modified on 12/20/2016 to correct filer(mflo, ).
December 16, 2016 Filing 415 JOINT DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES ON BEHALF OF HOLDER PROPERTIES, INC.,ADESSO/Columbia, LLC AND KEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. by Holder Properties Inc. and ADESSO/Columbia, LLC, and Key Construction(Norton, Erik) Modified on 12/19/2016 to add filing parties (mflo, ).
December 16, 2016 Filing 414 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Reliance Interiors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV of Craig Rogers, P.E.)(Mahon, Christy)
December 16, 2016 Filing 413 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elkin's Report, #2 Exhibit Elkin's CV, #3 Exhibit Melson's CV)(Wilkes, Michael)
December 16, 2016 Filing 412 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
December 16, 2016 Filing 411 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Graystone of Florida, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV)(Walsh, James) Modified on 12/19/2016 to correct filer (mflo, ).
December 16, 2016 Filing 410 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Still CV)(Teague, Carl)
December 16, 2016 Filing 409 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc. (Attachments: #1 Rogers' Curriculum Vitae)(McCue, Joey)
December 16, 2016 Filing 408 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cavaroc's Curriculum Vitae)(McCue, Joey)
December 16, 2016 Filing 407 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Holland Roofing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Rogers' Curriculum Vitae)(McCue, Joey)
December 16, 2016 Filing 406 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Flooring Services Inc.(Cleveland, David)
December 16, 2016 Filing 405 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure by Advanced Door Systems Inc.(Collins, Gregory)
December 16, 2016 Filing 404 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
December 16, 2016 Filing 403 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Filing 402 Amended Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Boyd, Brent)
December 15, 2016 Filing 401 MOTION for Dismiss by GrayStone of Florida Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2016. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Walsh, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2016 attachment was filed separately: #1 Memo in Support) (mflo, ).
December 15, 2016 Filing 400 REPLY by Reliance Interiors Inc to #394 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim . (Mahon, Christy)
December 14, 2016 Filing 398 Amended Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hester Drywall Inc.(Shaw, Joshua)
December 12, 2016 Filing 397 TEXT ORDER granting #391 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Case Management Order as to defendant Structural Preservation Systems to allow an additional 30 days for its expert disclosure. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/12/16.(mflo, )
December 9, 2016 Filing 396 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Towers Paint Contractors Inc by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
December 9, 2016 Filing 395 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Boyd, Brent)
December 8, 2016 Filing 394 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Meza Isidro and Reliance Interiors by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline) Modified on 12/9/2016 to add cross claimant (mflo, ).
December 8, 2016 Filing 393 AMENDED Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Vistas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Richard J. Rogers, M.B.A., P.E. CV)(Stubbs, Sidney)
December 8, 2016 Filing 392 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gill Plumbing Company. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2016. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mahon, Christy)
December 8, 2016 Filing 391 MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Scheduling Order Motion for Leave to Amend by Structural Preservation Systems LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2016. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)No proposed order.(Parker, Theodore)
December 6, 2016 Filing 390 Holland Roofing, Inc.'s ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Holland Roofing Inc.(McCue, Joey)
December 6, 2016 Filing 389 Aquarian Pools of Columbia, Inc.'s ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc.(McCue, Joey)
December 6, 2016 Filing 388 All-South Electrical Constructors, Inc's ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
December 2, 2016 Filing 387 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
December 1, 2016 Filing 385 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
November 30, 2016 Filing 384 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Stair, Kent)
November 30, 2016 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Trippett Boineau, III on behalf of Southern Vistas Inc (Boineau, Robert)
November 30, 2016 Filing 382 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc, Meza Isidro, Key Construction Inc by Reliance Interiors Inc.(Mahon, Christy)
November 30, 2016 Filing 381 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Towers Paint Contractors Inc served on 11/23/2016, answer due 12/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Registered Agent for Towers Paint Contractors, Inc.)(Smith, Franklin)
November 29, 2016 Filing 380 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Meza Isidro served on 11/22/2016, answer due 12/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Isidro Meza)(Smith, Franklin)
November 22, 2016 Filing 379 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
November 22, 2016 Filing 378 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated.(Drew, Ellis)
November 18, 2016 Filing 377 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint, Fourth Amended Complaint by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
November 17, 2016 Filing 376 Summons Issued as to Towers Paint Contractors Inc of 4th Amended Complaint. (mflo, )
November 17, 2016 Filing 375 Summons Issued as to Meza Isidro of 4th Amended Complaint. (mflo, )
November 17, 2016 Filing 374 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by William Durkin, ADESSO Homeowners Association, Emad Tadros, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Service due by 2/21/2017 (Attachments: #1 Summons Isidro Meza, #2 Summons Towers Paint Contractors, Inc.) (Smith, Franklin)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER that Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Fourth Amended Complaint and no current defendant will be required to file a response to same. Assuming service is effectuated upon the new defendants, Isidro Meza and Towers Paint Contractors, Inc., they are required to respond. granting #370 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/16/16.(mflo, )
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER that Tara C. Sullivan shall be relieved as counsel of record on behalf of Adesso/Holder Defendants and attorneys Howard A. VanDine, III, and Erik T. Norton of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, will continue to represent the Adesso/Holder Defendants in this matter; granting #369 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/16/16.(mflo, )
November 15, 2016 Filing 370 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, William Durkin, Emad Tadros. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Smith, Franklin)
November 11, 2016 Filing 369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Drake Adesso LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, JRH Adesso LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/1/2016. No proposed order.(Sullivan, Tara)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER AMENDING #230 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER; finding as moot #364 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #367 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/7/2016.(cbru, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 367 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by ADESSO Columbia LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Norton, Erik)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #365 MOTION to Quash Notice of Deposition of Key Construction, Inc. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/07/2016.(bshr, )
November 4, 2016 Filing 365 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash Notice of Deposition of Key Construction, Inc. ( Response to Motion due by 11/21/2016.) by Key Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Key Construction, Inc., #2 Exhibit Order Amending Case Management Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jones, Michal) (Main Document 365 replaced on 11/7/2016) (mdea, ).
November 4, 2016 Filing 364 MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Scheduling Order by ADESSO Columbia LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Norton, Erik)
November 2, 2016 Filing 363 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
November 2, 2016 Filing 362 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
October 28, 2016 Filing 361 REPLY to Response to Motion re #346 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #345 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC. (Horton, Greg)
October 26, 2016 Filing 360 TEXT ORDER granting #359 Motion for Extension of Time until October 28, 2016 to file a reply to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendant Andersen Windows and Silver Line Building Products Motions to Dismiss. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/26/16.(mflo, ) Modified on 10/26/2016 to add text (mflo, ).
October 25, 2016 Filing 359 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a reply to plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to motions to dismiss by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC with the consent of the Plaintiff. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2016. No proposed order.(Horton, Greg) Modified on 10/26/2016 to edit text (mflo, ).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER that Dunn D. Hollingsworth and Jillian S. Barton shall be substituted as counsel of record on behalf of JR Hobbs Co. in this action, and Joseph S. McCue and Andrew N. Cole of Collins & Lacy, P.C. shall be stricken as counsel of record on behalf of JR Hobbs Co. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/24/16. (mflo, )
October 21, 2016 Filing 356 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 354 Reason: filed using the wrong event code, Corrected Filing Document Number #355 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 10/19/16 (mflo, )
October 21, 2016 Filing 355 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artistic Enterprises Inc. Benito Galicia served on 10/5/2016, answer due 10/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Affidavit of Service)(McCants, John)
October 14, 2016 Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re #346 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #345 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, William Durkin, Emad Tadros, Sam Vause, Jr.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/24/2016 (Smith, Franklin)
October 12, 2016 Filing 352 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
October 12, 2016 Filing 351 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
October 5, 2016 Filing 350 REPLY to Crossclaim #318 of Southern Vistas, Inc. by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc.(Norton, Erik)
October 4, 2016 Filing 349 REPLY to Crossclaim #312 by Reliance Interiors Inc.(Mahon, Christy)
October 4, 2016 Filing 348 REPLY by Flooring Services Inc to #313 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,, of Holder Properties, Inc and Adesso/Columbia, LLC. (Kearney, Lauren)
September 30, 2016 Filing 347 STIPULATION IN LIEU OF FULL ANSWER TO THE CROSSCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT KEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. by SRS Concrete Finishing. (Elliott, Edward)
September 30, 2016 Filing 346 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Silver Line Building Products LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Horton, Greg)
September 30, 2016 Filing 345 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andersen Windows Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Horton, Greg)
September 29, 2016 Filing 343 TEXT ORDER granting #342 Motion to Substitute Attorney, substituting Christy E. Mahon, Esq. as counsel for Defendant Reliance Interiors, Inc. and relieving Joseph S. McCue, Esq. as counsel of record. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/29/2016.(bshr, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 342 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Reliance Interiors Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2016. No proposed order.(Mahon, Christy). Modified on 9/29/2016 to replace main document with motion/corrected version(bshr, ).
September 23, 2016 Filing 340 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint, by Structural Preservation Systems LLC.(Parker, Theodore)
September 23, 2016 Filing 338 Consent ORDER substituting Dunn D. Hollingsworth, Esq. as counsel of record for Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc. and directing that Joseph S. McCue, Esq. and Andrew N. Cole, Esq. are relieved as counsel of record. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/23/2016. (bshr, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 337 REPLY by Commercial Building Services Inc to #313 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim,,,,,,,, of Holder Properties, Inc and Adesso/Columbia, LLC. (Strickland, Robert)
September 23, 2016 Filing 336 ANSWER REPLY to Crossclaim #313 of Holder Properties, Inc. and ADESSO/Columbia, LLC by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
September 22, 2016 Filing 335 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Rogers, John)
September 22, 2016 Filing 334 REPLY by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc to #313 Answer to Third Amended Complaint, Crossclaim of Holder/Adesso. (Richardson, Andrew)
September 22, 2016 Filing 333 REPLY by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc to #301 Stipulation Crossclaims of Key Construction. (Richardson, Andrew)
September 22, 2016 Filing 332 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Walsh, James)
September 19, 2016 Filing 329 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
September 19, 2016 Filing 328 REPLY ANSWER to Complaint Cross Claim of Key Construction, Inc. by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline)
September 19, 2016 Filing 327 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
September 19, 2016 Filing 326 SOUTHERN VISTA'S AMENDED ANSWER REPLY to Crossclaim #313 OF KEY CONSTRUCTION, CROSSCLAIM BACK against Key Construction Inc by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 19, 2016 Filing 325 REPLY by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc to #301 Stipulation Answer to Key's Cross-Claims. (Wilkes, Michael)
September 19, 2016 Filing 324 REPLY by Silver Line Building Products LLC to Cross-Claims of Key Construction. (Horton, Greg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 323 REPLY by Andersen Windows Inc to Cross-Claims of Key Construction. (Horton, Greg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 322 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 of Holder/Adesso by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 321 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 of Holder/Adesso by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 320 TEXT ORDER granting #317 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/30/16 for defendants Andersen Windows, Inc and Silver Line Building Products to file a motion to dismiss. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/19/16.(mflo, )
September 19, 2016 Filing 319 REPLY to Crossclaim #313 by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline)
September 19, 2016 Filing 318 DEFENDANT SOUTHERN VISTA, INC'S ANSWER to Complaint CROSS-CLAIM OF HOLDER PROPERTIES RAISED IN RESPONSE TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM AND CROSS-CLAIM BACK against Holder Properties Inc by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 19, 2016 Filing 317 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs, Holder Properties, Inc., Key Construction, Inc., & by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2016. No proposed order.(Horton, Greg)
September 16, 2016 Filing 316 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint Third Amended by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
September 16, 2016 Filing 315 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint Third Amended by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
September 16, 2016 Filing 314 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 313 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Ace Glass Company Inc, Advanced Door Systems Inc, All-South Electrical Constructors Inc, Andersen Windows Inc, Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc, Artistic Enterprises Inc, Browder and LeGuizamon and Associates Inc, Capitol City Custom Iron Works and Fence LLC, Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated, Commercial Building Services Inc, Dryvit Systems Inc, Fernandez Contractors International Inc, Flooring Services Inc, Gill Plumbing Company, GrayStone of Florida Inc, Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc, Hester Drywall Inc, Holland Roofing Inc, Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc, JR Hobbs Co, Jamco Doors, Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc, Key Construction Inc, Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc, Niles Bolton Associates Inc, Reliance Interiors Inc, SDI Solutions LLC, SRS Concrete Finishing, STO Corp, Silver Line Building Products LLC, Southern Fireproofing Company Inc, Southern Vistas Inc, Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc, Structural Preservation Systems LLC, Taylor Brothers Construction Company Inc, Winston Steel LLC by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc.(Norton, Erik)
September 16, 2016 Filing 312 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Reliance Interiors Inc by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline)
September 16, 2016 Filing 311 STIPULATION IN LIEU OF RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated. (Drew, Ellis)
September 16, 2016 Filing 310 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
September 16, 2016 Filing 309 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
September 16, 2016 Filing 308 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
September 16, 2016 Filing 307 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint by STO Corp.(Newberry, Derek)
September 15, 2016 Filing 306 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc. (Rogers, John)
September 14, 2016 Filing 305 ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
September 13, 2016 Filing 304 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ace Glass Company Inc.(Shealy, Samuel)
September 13, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Michael Newberry on behalf of STO Corp (Newberry, Derek)
September 12, 2016 Filing 301 STIPULATION In Lieu of Fully Realleging Defenses to Cross-Claims by Key Construction Inc. (Howser, R)
September 12, 2016 Filing 300 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Teague, Carl)
September 12, 2016 Filing 299 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
September 12, 2016 Filing 298 SOUTHERN VISTA'S ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS OF KEY CONSTRUCTION AND CROSS-CLAIM BACK IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to #232 Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Key Construction Inc by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 12, 2016 Filing 297 SOUTHERN VISTA'S ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS OF HOLDER PROPERTIES ANSWER to #232 Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Holder Properties Inc by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 9, 2016 Filing 296 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by JR Hobbs Co. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 295 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JR Hobbs Co.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 294 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Boyd, Brent)
September 9, 2016 Filing 293 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Reliance Interiors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 292 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Holland Roofing Inc.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 291 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 290 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 289 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Gill Plumbing Company.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 288 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by JR Hobbs Co.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 287 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 286 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 285 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Reliance Interiors Inc. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 284 STIPULATION In Lieu of Reponsive Pleadings by Holland Roofing Inc. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 283 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 282 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Gill Plumbing Company. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 281 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc. (McCue, Joey)
September 9, 2016 Filing 280 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 279 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Properties Inc.(Norton, Erik)
September 9, 2016 Filing 278 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Hester Drywall Inc.(Shaw, Joshua)
September 9, 2016 Filing 277 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
September 9, 2016 Filing 276 Defendant Capital Group, LLC's Answers to Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Capital Group, LLC.(Kennedy, Robert)
September 9, 2016 Filing 275 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline)
September 9, 2016 Filing 274 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Advanced Door Systems Inc.(Boineau, Robert)
September 9, 2016 Filing 273 Key Construction Inc.'s Responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Key Construction Inc.(Howser, R)
September 9, 2016 Filing 272 STIPULATION re #241 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, #151 Answer to Complaint, #150 Reply to Crossclaim, #149 Answer to Complaint by Artistic Enterprises Inc. (McCants, John)
September 9, 2016 Filing 271 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
September 9, 2016 Filing 270 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Vistas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV)(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 9, 2016 Filing 268 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Sperry, Paul)
September 9, 2016 Filing 267 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Flooring Services Inc.(Kearney, Lauren)
September 9, 2016 Filing 266 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flooring Services Inc.(Kearney, Lauren)
September 9, 2016 Filing 265 ANSWER to Complaint of Key Construction by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Walsh, James)
September 9, 2016 Filing 264 STIPULATION in Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Hester Drywall Inc. (Shaw, Joshua)
September 9, 2016 Filing 263 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
September 9, 2016 Filing 262 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
September 9, 2016 Filing 261 STIPULATION (Amended) in Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Commercial Building Services Inc. (Strickland, Robert)
September 9, 2016 Filing 260 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime, William Durkin, Emad Tadros, Sam Vause, Jr.(Smith, Franklin)
September 8, 2016 Filing 259 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Sperry, Paul)
September 8, 2016 Filing 258 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
September 8, 2016 Filing 257 STIPULATION in Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Advanced Door Systems Inc. (Collins, Gregory)
September 8, 2016 Filing 256 STIPULATION (Amended) in Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Ace Glass Company Inc. (Shealy, Samuel)
September 8, 2016 Filing 255 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint (Third) by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
September 8, 2016 Filing 254 STIPULATION re #232 Second Amended Complaint In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Commercial Building Services Inc. (Strickland, Robert)
September 8, 2016 Filing 253 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint, by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
September 8, 2016 Filing 252 STIPULATION in Lieu of Responsive Pleading by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc. (Richardson, Andrew)
September 8, 2016 Filing 250 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Flooring Services Inc. (Cleveland, David)
September 8, 2016 Filing 249 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc. (Orr, Lawrence)
September 8, 2016 Filing 248 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc. (Orr, Lawrence)
September 7, 2016 Filing 247 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Rogers, John)
September 7, 2016 Filing 246 STIPULATION in Lieu of Full Answer to 2nd and 3rd Amended Complaints and Realleging Cross-Claims and Third Party Claims by Key Construction Inc. (Howser, R)
September 7, 2016 Filing 245 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Niles Bolton Associates Inc. (Stair, Kent)
September 7, 2016 Filing 244 ANSWER to #239 Third Amended Complaint by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Walsh, James)
September 7, 2016 Filing 243 ANSWER to #232 Second Amended Complaint by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Walsh, James)
September 1, 2016 Filing 242 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Benito Galicia. (bshr, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 241 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Benito Galicia by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
August 31, 2016 Filing 240 Summons Issued as to STO Corp. (bshr, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 239 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by William Durkin, ADESSO Homeowners Association, Emad Tadros, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Service due by 12/2/2016 (Smith, Franklin). Modified on 9/1/2016 to remove exhibit and file separately as ECF No. #240 (bshr, ). Modified on 1/4/2017 to edit text(mflo, ).
August 31, 2016 Filing 238 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Durkin, Sam Vause, Jr, ADESSO Homeowners Association, Emad Tadros, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Summons and Second Amended Complaint Structural Preservation Systems LLC served on 8/30/2016, answer due 9/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Structural Preservation Systems, LLC)(Smith, Franklin)
August 30, 2016 Filing 237 ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
August 30, 2016 Filing 236 STIPULATION In Lieu of Responsive Pleadings by Ace Glass Company Inc. (Shealy, Samuel)
August 29, 2016 Filing 235 Summons Issued as to Structural Preservation Systems LLC. (bshr, )
August 29, 2016 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Nicole Kearney on behalf of Flooring Services Inc (Kearney, Lauren)
August 29, 2016 Filing 232 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against All Defendants, filed by William Durkin, ADESSO Homeowners Association, Emad Tadros, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Service due by 12/1/2016 (Smith, Franklin). Modified on 8/30/2016 to remove attachment and file separately as ECF No. #235 (bshr, ).
August 26, 2016 Filing 231 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brent Morris Boyd for September 27-30, 2016 (Boyd, Brent)
August 23, 2016 Filing 230 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Important: Review PDF Document for Full Explanation of Deadlines. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 08/23/2016. (bshr, )
August 23, 2016 Filing 229 REPLY/Answer to #19 Crossclaims of Holder Properties, Inc.; Adesso/Columbia, LLC; Drake/Adesso, LLC; Holder Adesso, LLC; and JRH Adesso, LLC by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc. (Richardson, Andrew)
August 23, 2016 Filing 228 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
August 4, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by R Davis Howser on behalf of Key Construction Inc (Howser, R)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE The Court will conduct the conference, in chambers, on Wednesday, August 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in the Matthew J. Perry, Jr. Federal Courthouse, 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/29/16. (mflo, )
July 20, 2016 Filing 225 REPLY to Response to Motion re #186 MOTION to Strike #175 Reply to Crossclaim Response filed by Commercial Building Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 11 Consultations)(Strickland, Robert)
July 20, 2016 Filing 224 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant Key Construction Inc (Cross-claiming defendant) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS DRAKE/ADESSO, LLC; HOLDER ADESSO, LLC; JRH ADESSO, LLC; JRH, LLC; AND JOHN R. HOLDER, INDIVIDUALLY. This Stipulation is subject to the Tolling Agreement. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/20/16. (mflo, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 223 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Trautman, M Caroline)
July 19, 2016 Filing 222 Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc.'s Answer to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(McCue, Joey)
July 19, 2016 Filing 221 Reliance Interiors, Inc.'s Answer to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Reliance Interiors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
July 19, 2016 Filing 220 All South Electrical Conductors, Inc.'s Answer to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
July 18, 2016 Filing 218 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated.(Drew, Ellis)
July 18, 2016 Filing 217 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated.(Drew, Ellis)
July 18, 2016 Filing 216 SERVICE by Publication filed by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Last publication date 07/08/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service by Publication)(Smith, Franklin)
July 15, 2016 Filing 215 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commercial Building Services Inc. Will Whitaker served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. Third Party Complaint on Third Party Defendant, Will Whitaker (Strickland, Robert). Modified on 7/18/2016 to correct event code(bshr, ).
July 15, 2016 Filing 213 TEXT ORDER granting #212 Motion to Substitute Attorney; Added attorney M Caroline Lindsey Trautman for Dryvit Systems Inc. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/15/16.(mflo, )
July 12, 2016 Filing 212 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney M. Caroline Trautman by Dryvit Systems Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Trautman, M Caroline). Modified on 7/14/2016 to replace proposed order with motion/corrected document(bshr, ).
July 11, 2016 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #186 MOTION to Strike #175 Reply to Crossclaim Response filed by Key Construction Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/21/2016 (Walsh, Courtney)
July 11, 2016 Filing 209 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing Defendants Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, JRH Adesso, LLC, JRH, LLC, and John R. Holder, Individually without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 07/11/2016. (bshr, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 208 Third-Party Defendant Capital Group, LLC's ANSWER to #142 Third Party Complaint of Commercial Building Services, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Will Whitaker by Capital Group, LLC.(Kennedy, Robert)
July 7, 2016 Filing 207 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Capital Group, LLC.(Kennedy, Robert)
July 7, 2016 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mills Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Capital Group, LLC (Kennedy, Robert)
June 30, 2016 Filing 205 REPLY by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc.'s Answer to Key Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Claims. (McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 204 ANSWER to Complaint Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 203 Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc.'s REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of ADESSO/Columbia, LLC, Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, and JRH Adesso, LLC by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 202 REPLY by Reliance Interiors Inc Reliance Interiors, Inc.'s Answer to Key Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Claims. (McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 201 ANSWER to Complaint Reliance Interiors, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Reliance Interiors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 200 Reliance Interirors, Inc.'s REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of ADESSO/Columbia, LLC, Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, and JRH Adesso, LLC by Reliance Interiors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 199 REPLY by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc All-South Electrical Conductors, Inc,'s Answer to Key Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Claims. (McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 198 ALL-SOUTH ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS, INC.'S REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of HOLDER PROPERTIES, INC., ADESSO/COLUMBIA, LLC, DRAKE/ADESSO, LLC, HOLDER ADESSO, LLC, AND JRH ADESSO, LLC. by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 197 ANSWER to Complaint All-South Electrical Conductors, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 196 Southern Fireproofing Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 195 Reliance Interiors, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Reliance Interiors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 194 All-South Electrical Conductors' ANSWER to Complaint by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(McCue, Joey)
June 30, 2016 Filing 192 TEXT ORDER granting #187 , #188 , #189 , #190 , #191 Motions to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for R. Bryan Barnes, Esq., Mary L. Dinkins, Esq., Steven T. Moon, Esq., and Franklin H. Turner III, Esq. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 06/30/2016.(bshr, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 191 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for R. Bryan Barnes, Esq. and Mary L. Dinkins, Esq. by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McCue, Joey). Modified on 6/30/2016 to replace document with corrected version (proposed order with motion)(bshr, ).
June 27, 2016 Filing 190 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for R. Bryan Barnes, Esq. and Mary L. Dinkins, Esq. by Reliance Interiors Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McCue, Joey). Modified on 6/30/2016 to replace document with corrected version (proposed order with motion)(bshr, ).
June 27, 2016 Filing 189 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for Franklin H. Turner III, Esq. and R. Bryan Barnes, Esq. by Holland Roofing Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McCue, Joey). Modified on 6/30/2016 to replace document with corrected version (proposed order with motion)(bshr, ).
June 27, 2016 Filing 188 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for Steven T. Moon, Esq. and R. Bryan Barnes, Esq. by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(McCue, Joey). Modified on 6/30/2016 to replace document with corrected version (proposed order with motion)(bshr, ).
June 27, 2016 Filing 187 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph S. McCue, Esq. for R. Bryan Barnes, Esq. and Mary L. Dinkins, Esq. by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McCue, Joey). Modified on 6/30/2016 to replace document with corrected version (proposed order with motion)(bshr, ).
June 22, 2016 Filing 186 MOTION to Strike #175 Reply to Crossclaim by Commercial Building Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2016. No proposed order.(Gerrald, Matthew)
June 22, 2016 Filing 185 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Commercial Building Services Inc. on Third Party Defendant Capital Group, LLC served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (Gerrald, Matthew)
June 20, 2016 Filing 184 TEXT ORDER granting #183 MOTION for Service by Publication on Capitol City Custom Iron Works & Fence, LLC. Plaintiff has thirty days in which to serve Defendant Capitol City Custom Iron Works by publication pursuant to South Carolina statute. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 06/20/2016.(bshr, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 183 MOTION for Service by Publication on Capitol City Custom Iron Works & Fence, LLC by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Letter serving Registered Agent, #3 Exhibit B - Secretary of State printout, #4 Exhibit C - USPS Tracking Information, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Non-Service, #6 Exhibit E - Opinion - Clyburn v. Champagne, #7 Exhibit F - Affidavit in Support of Service by Publication)No proposed order.(Smith, Franklin)
June 13, 2016 Filing 181 CONSENT ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL substituting David C. Cleveland as counsel of record for Defendant Flooring Services, Inc. and relieving Mark Koontz. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 06/13/2016. (bshr, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 180 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Flooring Services, Inc.'s #177 Motion for Order of Protection is denied. This Court will do its best to schedule hearings and conferences around the conflicts of the attorneys in this case. However, given the shear number of parties, that may not be practicable. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 06/13/2016.(bshr, )
June 6, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Christopher Brandon Belger for July 18, 2016 to July 22, 2016 (Belger, Christopher)
June 3, 2016 Filing 177 MOTION for Protective Order by Flooring Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2016. No proposed order.(Koontz, William)
June 2, 2016 Filing 176 Defendant Key Construction's REPLY to Crossclaim #116 of Holland Roofing, Inc. by Key Construction Inc.(Walsh, Courtney)
June 2, 2016 Filing 175 Defendant Key Construction's REPLY to Crossclaim #115 Counter Cross-Complaints of Commercial Building Services, Inc. by Key Construction Inc.(Walsh, Courtney)
June 1, 2016 Filing 174 REPLY by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated Amended Reply and Crossclaims against Defendant Holland Roofing. (Drew, Ellis)
May 25, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Greg Horton for May 30 June 10; July 11 15; July 22 23; August 24 27; October 19 21, 2016 (Horton, Greg)
May 24, 2016 Filing 172 Graystone of Florida, Inc.'s REPLY to Crossclaim #19 Holders Properties, Inc., Adesso/Columbia, LLC, Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, and JRH Adesso, LLC by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Boyd, Brent)
May 24, 2016 Filing 171 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr for 7/4/16 - 7/15/16; 8/1/16 - 8/5/16 (Richardson, Andrew)
May 20, 2016 Filing 170 TEXT ORDER granting #169 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All-South Electrical Constructors, Reliance Interiors Inc, and Southern Fireproofing Company Inc answers to Complaint and Cross-Claims due 6/30/2016. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 05/20/2016.(bshr, )
May 19, 2016 Filing 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc, Reliance Interiors Inc, Southern Fireproofing Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/6/2016. No proposed order.(Barnes, Robert)
May 18, 2016 Filing 168 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
May 17, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Franklin H Turner, III for June 26, 2016 through July 14, 2016 (Turner, Franklin)
May 11, 2016 Filing 166 REPLY by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated to Cross-Claims of Deft Holland Roofing, Inc.. (Drew, Ellis)
May 11, 2016 Filing 165 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Tyler Paul Winton for May 12, 2016 through May 17, 2016 and June 3, 2016 through June 21, 2016 (Winton, Tyler)
May 10, 2016 Filing 164 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joey McCue for June 6-13, 2016 (McCue, Joey)
May 10, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Joey McCue for June 6-13, 2016 (McCue, Joey)
May 10, 2016 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Walsh, James)
May 3, 2016 Filing 160 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Reliance Interiors Inc.(Barnes, Robert)
May 3, 2016 Filing 159 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Fireproofing Company Inc.(Barnes, Robert)
May 3, 2016 Filing 158 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc.(Barnes, Robert)
May 3, 2016 Filing 157 ANSWER REPLY to #19 Crossclaim OF HOLDER DEFENDANTS by Key Construction Inc.(Walsh, Courtney)
May 3, 2016 Filing 156 ANSWER to #19 Crossclaim of Defendant Key Construction, Inc. by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
May 2, 2016 Filing 155 ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by SRS Concrete Finishing.(Elliott, Edward)
April 29, 2016 Filing 154 REPLY by Niles Bolton Associates Inc to #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. (Stair, Kent)
April 29, 2016 Filing 153 REPLY to Crossclaim #84 by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Drake Adesso LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, JRH Adesso LLC.(Norton, Erik)
April 29, 2016 Filing 152 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
April 29, 2016 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint of Cross-Claims of Defendant Key Construction, Inc. by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
April 29, 2016 Filing 150 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Defendants Holders Properties, Inc.s Adesso/Columbia, LLCs, Drake/Adesso, LLCs, Holder Adesso, LLCs and JRH Adesso, LLCs Cross-Claims by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
April 29, 2016 Filing 149 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to First Amended Complaint by Artistic Enterprises Inc.(McCants, John)
April 28, 2016 Filing 148 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Robert Thomas Strickland for June 21, 2016 through July 4, 2016 (Strickland, Robert)
April 28, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brent Morris Boyd for 6-3-16 through 6-14-16 (Boyd, Brent)
April 28, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Gregory Gerrald on behalf of Commercial Building Services Inc (Gerrald, Matthew)
April 26, 2016 Filing 143 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Boyd, Brent)
April 25, 2016 Filing 145 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Capital Group, LLC. (bshr, )
April 25, 2016 Filing 144 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Will Whitaker. (bshr, )
April 25, 2016 Filing 142 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Capital Group, LLC, Will Whitaker, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Capital Group, LLC, Will Whitaker, filed by Commercial Building Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Cross-claims of Defendant Key Construction, Inc., #3 Exhibit Answer of Defendants Holder Properties, Inc., et al. and Cross-claims) (Strickland, Robert)
April 25, 2016 Filing 141 REPLY by Ace Glass Company Inc to #19 Crossclaim. (Shealy, Samuel)
April 25, 2016 Filing 140 TEXT ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint/Amended Complaint, Cross-Claims of Defendants Holder Properties, Inc., ADESSO/Columbia, LLC, Drake/ADESSO, LLC, Holder ADESSO, LLC and JRH ADESSO, LLC and Cross-claims of Defendants Key Construction, Inc. Artistic Enterprises Inc answers due 4/29/2016. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/25/2016. (bshr, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Lawrence Bradley Orr for July 15, 2016 through July 22, 2016 (Orr, Lawrence) Modified on 4/22/2016 to remove Dryvit Systems, Inc., as a filer per request of filing user. (bgoo)
April 22, 2016 Filing 138 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 22, 2016 Filing 137 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 136 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint Third Party Complaint of Key Construction by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 134 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Holder Properties by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Silver Line Building Products LLC.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 132 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 131 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 130 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Holder Properties by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Cross-Claim of Key Construction filed in State Court by Andersen Windows Inc. (Horton, Greg)
April 22, 2016 Filing 128 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Andersen Windows Inc.(Horton, Greg)
April 20, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Harjehausen on behalf of GrayStone of Florida Inc (Harjehausen, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Walsh on behalf of GrayStone of Florida Inc (Walsh, James)
April 20, 2016 Filing 124 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Artistic Enterprises Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/9/2016. No proposed order.(McCants, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 123 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Defendants Holder Properties, Inc., Adesso/Columbia, LLC, Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, and JRH Adesso, LLC by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
April 20, 2016 Filing 122 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
April 20, 2016 Filing 121 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
April 19, 2016 Filing 120 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Stair, Kent)
April 19, 2016 Filing 119 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Stair, Kent)
April 19, 2016 Filing 118 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Teague, Carl)
April 19, 2016 Filing 116 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated, Key Construction Inc by Holland Roofing Inc(Turner, Franklin).Modified on 4/22/2016 to replace document with corrected version per the request of the filing user(bshr, ).
April 18, 2016 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint (Cross-claims of Key Construction, Inc.), Counter CROSSCLAIM against Key Construction Inc by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
April 18, 2016 Filing 114 Reply to Cross-claim of Holder Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 18, 2016 Filing 113 Reply to Cross-claim of Key Construction, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 18, 2016 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 18, 2016 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint (Cross-Claims of Holder Properties, Inc., Adesso Columbia, LLC, Drake Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC and JRP Adesso, LLC) by Advanced Door Systems Inc.(Boineau, Robert)
April 18, 2016 Filing 110 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Third-Party Complaint and REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Dryvit Systems Inc.(Cranshaw, Bradford)
April 18, 2016 Filing 109 ANSWER to Cross-Claims of Key Construction, Inc. by Advanced Door Systems Inc.(Boineau, Robert)
April 18, 2016 Filing 108 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Advanced Door Systems Inc.(Boineau, Robert)
April 18, 2016 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Advanced Door Systems Inc. (Boineau, Robert)
April 18, 2016 Filing 106 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
April 18, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc to Cross-Claim of Key Construction, Inc.. (Orr, Lawrence)
April 18, 2016 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
April 18, 2016 Filing 103 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
April 18, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Bradley Orr on behalf of Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc (Orr, Lawrence)
April 18, 2016 Filing 101 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
April 18, 2016 Filing 100 REPLY by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc to Answer and Cross Claim of Key Construction, Inc.. (Richardson, Andrew)
April 15, 2016 Filing 99 REPLY by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated to Cross-Claims of Holder Properties, Inc., ADESSO/Columbia, LLC, Drake/ADESSO, LLC, Holder ADESSO, LLC and JRH ADESSO, LLC. (Drew, Ellis)
April 12, 2016 Filing 98 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
April 12, 2016 Filing 97 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
April 12, 2016 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by Commercial Building Services Inc.(Strickland, Robert)
April 12, 2016 Filing 95 JR HOBBS, CO.'S ANSWER to Complaint by JR Hobbs Co.(McCue, Joey)
April 12, 2016 Filing 94 ANSWER/REPLY by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc to #19 Crossclaim. (Wilkes, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. JRH LLC served on 4/5/2016, answer due 4/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on JRH, LLC)(Smith, Franklin)
April 12, 2016 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. John R Holder, Jr served on 4/5/2016, answer due 4/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Smith, Franklin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 91 TEXT ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answers to Complaint and Cross-Claims due by 5/31/2016. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/11/2016.(bshr, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint by Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc.(Richardson, Andrew)
April 11, 2016 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All-South Electrical Constructors Inc, JR Hobbs Co, Reliance Interiors Inc, Southern Fireproofing Company Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2016. No proposed order.(Barnes, Robert)
April 11, 2016 Filing 85 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Teague, Carl)
April 8, 2016 Filing 84 Southern Vistas, Inc.'s REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Holder Properties, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Holder Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
April 8, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY by Ace Glass Company Inc to Cross-Claims of Key Construction, Inc. (Shealy, Samuel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 82 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ace Glass Company Inc.(Shealy, Samuel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint by Ace Glass Company Inc.(Shealy, Samuel)
April 7, 2016 Filing 80 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Filing 79 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc.(Wilkes, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Filing 78 REPLY by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc to #1 Notice of Removal, Cross-Claim of Key Construction, Inc.. (Wilkes, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) First Amended Complaint by Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc. (Wilkes, Michael)
April 7, 2016 Filing 76 REPLY by Niles Bolton Associates Inc to #1 Notice of Removal, Crossclaim of Key Construction. (Stair, Kent) (Main Document 76 replaced on 4/7/2016 as provided by filing user) (mflo, ).
April 7, 2016 Filing 75 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Holland Roofing Inc.(Turner, Franklin)
April 6, 2016 Filing 74 TEXT ORDER granting #72 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint, Third-Party Complaint of Key Construction, Inc., and Cross-Claim of Holder Properties, Inc. Answers due by 04/22/2016. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 04/06/2016.(bshr, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 72 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim #1 Notice of Removal by Andersen Windows Inc, Silver Line Building Products LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/25/2016. No proposed order.(Horton, Greg)
April 4, 2016 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Niles Bolton Associates Inc.(Stair, Kent)
April 4, 2016 Filing 70 REPLY by Gill Plumbing Company GILL PLUMBING COMPANY, INC.S ANSWER TO HOLDER PROPERTIES, INC.S, ADESSO/COLUMBIA, LLCS, DRAKE/ADESSO, LLCS, HOLDER ADESSO, LLCS, AND JRH ADESSO, LLC.S CROSS-CLAIMS. (McCue, Joey)
April 4, 2016 Filing 69 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 4, 2016 Filing 68 ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN VISTAS, INC. REPLY to Crossclaim #34 by Key Construction Inc.(Walsh, Courtney)
April 4, 2016 Filing 67 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 of Holder Properties, Inc., Adesso/Columbia, LLC, Drake/Adesso, LLC, Holder Adesso, LLC, and JRH Adesso, LLC by Hester Drywall Inc.(Shaw, Joshua)
April 4, 2016 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint by Flooring Services Inc.(Koontz, William)
April 4, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Koontz on behalf of Flooring Services Inc (Koontz, William)
April 1, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent T Stair on behalf of Niles Bolton Associates Inc (Stair, Kent)
April 1, 2016 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Rogers, John)
April 1, 2016 Filing 60 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc.(Rogers, John)
April 1, 2016 Filing 59 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Holland Roofing Inc.(Turner, Franklin)
March 31, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated to Cross-Claims of Key Construction, Inc.. (Drew, Ellis)
March 31, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Ross Beheler Shealy on behalf of Ace Glass Company Inc (Shealy, Samuel)
March 31, 2016 Filing 56 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc.(Moon, Steven)
March 31, 2016 Filing 55 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hester Drywall Inc.(Shaw, Joshua)
March 31, 2016 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint of Key Construction's Cross-Claims by Hester Drywall Inc.(Shaw, Joshua)
March 31, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Strickland on behalf of Commercial Building Services Inc (Strickland, Robert)
March 31, 2016 Filing 52 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Hester Drywall Inc(Shaw, Joshua). Modified on 3/31/2016 to edit text(bshr, ).
March 30, 2016 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. Silver Line Building Products LLC served on 2/22/2016, answer due 3/14/2016. (Smith, Franklin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. Flooring Services Inc served on 3/4/2016, answer due 3/25/2016. (Smith, Franklin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. Commercial Building Services Inc served on 3/3/2016, answer due 3/24/2016. (Smith, Franklin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADESSO Homeowners Association. Gill Plumbing Company served on 2/12/2016, answer due 3/4/2016. (Smith, Franklin)
March 29, 2016 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated by Holland Roofing Inc.(Turner, Franklin)
March 29, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Shaw on behalf of Hester Drywall Inc (Shaw, Joshua)
March 29, 2016 Filing 45 REPLY by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc Answer to Cross-Claim of Key Construction, Inc.. (Moon, Steven)
March 28, 2016 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Third-Party Complaint. Answer to Third-Party Complaint due by 04/20/2016. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 03/28/2016.(bshr, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time by GrayStone of Florida Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2016. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Walsh, James)
March 25, 2016 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc.(Moon, Steven)
March 24, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated.(Drew, Ellis)
March 24, 2016 Filing 39 Third Party Defendant, GrayStone of Florida, Inc's Answer to Third Party Complaint of Key Construction, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by GrayStone of Florida Inc.(Majure, Christopher)
March 24, 2016 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Scott Harvey and Leonard Greene by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott A. Harvey, AIA, #2 Affidavit of Leonard A. Greene, P.E>)(Smith, Franklin)
March 24, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen S Cheek on behalf of Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc (Cheek, Ellen)
March 23, 2016 Filing 36 REPLY by Holland Roofing Inc Answer to Cross-Claim of Key Construction, Inc. (Turner, Franklin)
March 23, 2016 Filing 35 REPLY to Crossclaim #19 by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
March 23, 2016 Filing 32 REPLY by Gill Plumbing Company Amended Answer to Key Construction Inc.'s Cross-Claims. (McCue, Joey)
March 23, 2016 Filing 31 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Vistas Inc.(Stubbs, Sidney)
March 23, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael BT Wilkes on behalf of Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc (Wilkes, Michael)
March 22, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Markey Stubbs on behalf of Southern Vistas Inc (Stubbs, Sidney)
March 21, 2016 Filing 28 REPLY by Gill Plumbing Company Answer to Key Construction Inc.'s Cross-Claims. (McCue, Joey)
March 21, 2016 Filing 27 GIll Plumbing Company, Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Gill Plumbing Company.(McCue, Joey)
March 21, 2016 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Artistic Enterprises, Inc. to Answer by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime. (Smith, Franklin)
March 21, 2016 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ADESSO Homeowners Association, ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime.(Smith, Franklin)
March 21, 2016 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Key Construction Inc.(Hershon, Lawrence)
March 21, 2016 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Key Construction Inc.(Hershon, Lawrence)
March 18, 2016 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gill Plumbing Company.(McCue, Joey)
March 18, 2016 Filing 21 Gill Plumbing Company Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Gill Plumbing Company.(McCue, Joey)
March 18, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (of Key Construction's Cross-Claims) by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Drake Adesso LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, JRH Adesso LLC.(Norton, Erik)
March 18, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), CROSSCLAIM against Ace Glass Company Inc, Advanced Door Systems Inc, All-South Electrical Constructors Inc, Andersen Windows Inc, Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc, Artistic Enterprises Inc, Browder and LeGuizamon and Associates Inc, Capitol City Custom Iron Works and Fence LLC, Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated, Commercial Building Services Inc, Dryvit Systems Inc, Fernandez Contractors International Inc, Flooring Services Inc, Gill Plumbing Company, GrayStone of Florida Inc, Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc, Hester Drywall Inc, Holland Roofing Inc, Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc, JR Hobbs Co, Jamco Doors, Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc, Key Construction Inc, Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc, Niles Bolton Associates Inc, Reliance Interiors Inc, SDI Solutions LLC, SRS Concrete Finishing, Silver Line Building Products LLC, Southern Fireproofing Company Inc, Southern Vistas Inc, Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc, Taylor Brothers Construction Company Inc, Winston Steel LLC by JRH Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Drake Adesso LLC.(Norton, Erik)
March 16, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Removal)(Norton, Erik)
March 16, 2016 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc.(Moon, Steven)
March 10, 2016 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Holland Roofing Inc.(Turner, Franklin)
March 10, 2016 Filing 13 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
March 10, 2016 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
March 10, 2016 Filing 11 REPLY by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc Answer to Cross-Claim of Key Construction, Inc.. (Orr, Lawrence)
March 10, 2016 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
March 10, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc.(Orr, Lawrence)
March 9, 2016 Filing 34 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Key Construction, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Key Construction Inc by Southern Vistas Inc. ***Filed in State Court***(bshr, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Southern Vistas Inc. ***Filed in State Court***(bshr, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Todd Moon on behalf of Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc (Moon, Steven)
March 9, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Bradley Orr on behalf of Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc (Orr, Lawrence)
March 9, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin H Turner, III on behalf of Holland Roofing Inc (Turner, Franklin)
March 4, 2016 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Drake Adesso LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, JRH Adesso LLC. (bshr, )
March 4, 2016 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ADESSO Columbia LLC, Drake Adesso LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, JRH Adesso LLC.(bshr, )
March 4, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-CP-40-844. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-6433356), filed by JRH Adesso LLC, Holder Properties Inc, ADESSO Columbia LLC, Holder Adesso LLC, Drake Adesso LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John R. Holder, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Certificate of Service)(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADESSO Homeowners Association et al v. Holder Properties Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Steel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Glass Company Inc
Represented By: Samuel Ross Beheler Shealy
Represented By: John C Bruton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hester Drywall Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flooring Services Inc
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Vriesinga
Represented By: David Cooper Cleveland
Represented By: Christopher Brandon Belger
Represented By: William Mark Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Fireproofing Company Inc
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Dunn D Hollingsworth
Represented By: Joey McCue
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Vistas Inc
Represented By: Robert Trippett Boineau, III
Represented By: Joseph Bias
Represented By: Sidney Markey Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamco Doors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holder Adesso LLC
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Howard A VanDine, III
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRS Concrete Finishing
Represented By: Edward Glenn Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol City Custom Iron Works and Fence LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Holder, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADESSO Columbia LLC
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Howard A VanDine, III
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussey Gay Bell and DeYoung Inc
Represented By: Kathy Jane Price Elmore
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holder Properties Inc
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Howard A VanDine, III
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland Roofing Inc
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Franklin H Turner, III
Represented By: Joey McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRH Adesso LLC
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Howard A VanDine, III
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STO Corp
Represented By: Alan Ross Belcher, Jr
Represented By: Derek Michael Newberry
Represented By: Paul Barry Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Fence Suppliers of SC Inc
Represented By: Chad Graham
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Represented By: Carl Reed Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Adesso LLC
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Represented By: Howard A VanDine, III
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Preservation Systems LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline D Phillips
Represented By: Theodore Parker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquarian Pools of Columbia Inc
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Joey McCue
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Represented By: Steven Todd Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Line Building Products LLC
Represented By: Dana Woodrum Lang
Represented By: Greg Horton
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Construction Inc
Represented By: Michal Cooper Jones
Represented By: R Davis Howser
Represented By: James Lynn Werner
Represented By: Courtney E Walsh
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Hershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dryvit Systems Inc
Represented By: M Caroline Lindsey Trautman
Represented By: Bradford William Cranshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Door Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert Trippett Boineau, III
Represented By: Gregory Brian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Plumbing Company
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: Joey McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernandez Contractors International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDI Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niles Bolton Associates Inc
Represented By: Kent T Stair
Represented By: Tyler Paul Winton
Represented By: Paul E Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Consulting Engineers Inc
Represented By: Kathy Jane Price Elmore
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Hobbs Co
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Dunn D Hollingsworth
Represented By: Joey McCue
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Represented By: Jillian Suzanne Barton
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrayStone of Florida Inc
Represented By: John David Harjehausen
Represented By: James P Walsh
Represented By: Brent Morris Boyd
Represented By: Christopher A Majure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Interiors Inc
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Mark Steven Barrow
Represented By: Joey McCue
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Brothers Construction Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andersen Windows Inc
Represented By: Dana Woodrum Lang
Represented By: Greg Horton
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Construction Materials Incorporated
Represented By: Ellis B Drew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-South Electrical Constructors Inc
Represented By: Andrew Cole
Represented By: Joey McCue
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan and Skala Engineers Inc
Represented By: Michael BT Wilkes
Represented By: Ellen S Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browder and LeGuizamon and Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meza Isidro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towers Paint Contractors Inc
Represented By: James C Cox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loveless Commercial Contracting Inc
Represented By: Andrew Luther Richardson, Jr
Represented By: John Adam Ribock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert Mills Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Benito Galicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADESSO Homeowners Association
Represented By: Jared Hudson Garraux
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Tadros
Represented By: Jared Hudson Garraux
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Vause, Jr
Represented By: Jared Hudson Garraux
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Durkin
Represented By: Jared Hudson Garraux
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADESSO Horizontal Property Regime
Represented By: Jared Hudson Garraux
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Will Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Commercial Building Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Gerrald
Represented By: Robert Thomas Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Artistic Enterprises Inc
Represented By: John Lucius McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?