Theo's Pizza LLC v. Integrity Brands LLC
Plaintiff: Theo's Pizza LLC
Defendant: Integrity Brands LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00039
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/20/2019.(asni, )
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/29/2018.(abuc)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND OPINION denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/3/2017.(mdea )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theo's Pizza LLC v. Integrity Brands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theo's Pizza LLC
Represented By: Tobias Gavin Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Brands LLC
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?