Brown et al v. Lexington County, South Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Twanda Marshinda Brown, Sasha Monique Darby, Cayeshia Cashel Johnson, Amy Marie Palacios and Xavier Larry Goodwin
Defendant: Lexington County, South Carolina, Gary Reinhart, Rebecca Adams, Robert Madsen and Bryan Koon
Case Number: 3:2017cv01426
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying 235 Motion for Protective Order; granting 242 Motion to Compel. Parties shall meet and confer regarding new deadlines for outstanding discovery and pretrial matters and submit a proposed amended scheduling order to the court within fourteen days of the entry of this order (Specific Document due 7/28/2021). Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 7/13/2021. (lbak)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 11/16/2020. (mmcd)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Nusrat Choudhury. (Attorney Nusrat Jahan Choudhury terminated.) Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 7/6/2020. (lbak)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER AND OPINION denying 158 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 6/18/2020.(lbak)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER AND OPINION denying 144 MOTION to Intervene. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 5/20/2020. (lbak)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/9/2018.(mdea )
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER declining to adopt 74 Report and Recommendation; denying Plaintiffs' 21 Motion to Certify Class; denying Defendants' 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to declaratory and injunctive relief; and denying Defendants' 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial handling. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/29/2018. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Lexington County, South Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanda Marshinda Brown
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Toby Marshall
Represented By: Eric Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasha Monique Darby
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Toby Marshall
Represented By: Eric Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayeshia Cashel Johnson
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Toby Marshall
Represented By: Eric Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Marie Palacios
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Toby Marshall
Represented By: Eric Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Larry Goodwin
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Toby Marshall
Represented By: Eric Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington County, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Koon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?