Boggs v. United States et al

Plaintiff: Richard E. Boggs
Defendant: United States, Department of Treasury, C. K. O'Neal and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv01915
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lexington
0 Judge: Shiva V Hodges
1 Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the US Attorney General by Richard E. Boggs. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt, #2 Process Server's Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(jpet, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard E. Boggs. United States served on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt, #2 Process Server's Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(jpet, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 Summonses Issued as to USA (US Attorney and Attorney General), #8 Order Service, and copy of the #1 Complaint placed in U.S. Mail to Richard E. Boggs. (bgoo)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons for United States Attorney for the District of South Carolina) (bgoo)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to remove the Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, and C.K. O'Neal as defendants in this matter, authorizing issuance of the summonses to Plaintiff for service of process on the United States Attorney and Attorney General, and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/20/2018. (bgoo)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard E. Boggs. (bgoo)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard E. Boggs. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300077221.) (Attachments: #1 Court's Standard Complaint Form, #2 Supporting Documents) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. K. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?