Jordan v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv02195
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order on Report and Recommendation, #14 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan PO Box 333 White Rock, SC 29177 (mflo, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 JUDGMENT in favor of JPMorgan Chase Bank against Diana Jordan. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the plaintiff, Diana Jordan take nothing and this action is is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. (mflo, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #9 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 9/4/18.(mflo, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 10 Transfer of Case Management, and #8 Order placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan. (bgoo)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, South Carolina 29201. (bgoo)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/14/2018. (bgoo)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/14/2018. (bgoo)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(jpet, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, filed by Diana Jordan. Service due by 11/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jpet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?