Smartphonerecords, LLC et al v. University of South Carolina, The et al

Plaintiff: SmartPhoneRecords, LLC, Damion Hollomon and Reyna Carrasco
Defendant: Christian Thibault, Donald Tomlin, Jr., 52 App, Inc., T Minus 6, LLC, Laura Corder, Tradeversity, Inc., Harry Huntley, Michael Meyers, The South Carolina Jobs-Economic Development Authority, Harris Pastides, Kelly Truesdale, Sowell & Grey and Associates, USC/Columbia Technology Incubator, Steve Leicht, Tina Cundari, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Brendan Lee, William Kirkland, John Owen, M. F. Bartlett, University of South Carolina, South Carolina Jobs-Economic Development Authority, The and University of South Carolina, The
Case Number: 3:2018cv02333
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Columbia Office
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 88 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 85. Reason: Attachments within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #87 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC re #83 Notice of Appearance, #84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Taylor, Mary) (Main Document 87 replaced on 8/30/2018) (cbru, ). Modified to link correct event to associated event and to edit text on 8/30/2018 (cbru, ).
August 29, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary)
August 29, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary McMullen Taylor on behalf of Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary)
August 22, 2018 Filing 82 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #80 Notice Other placed in U.S. Mail to Dina Elizabeth Micheletti, Jeffrey L. Fazio, Stephen Patrick Randall, Thomas Michael Downey, David Eric Rosen, Mark Joseph Nagle, Bryan Paul Sugar, Christopher John Bakes (cbru, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE OF TRANSFER (cbru, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 79 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00479. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/18, GRANTING defendants' motions to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the District of South Carolina. Defendants motions to dismiss are DENIED as MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and/or Transfer (ECF Nos. #58 , #66 , & #67 ) are SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 6/15/2018 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY by defendants to #70 Opposition to Motion to dismiss . (Randall, Stephen) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY by 52 App, Inc., Brendan Lee, John Owen, Christian Thibault, Tradeversity, Inc. in support of #58 Motion to Dismiss. (Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Crowder)(Bakes, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ADOPTING nunc pro tunc, as modified, the parties' stipulation filed at ECF No. #69 . Accordingly, Plaintiff's opposition briefs shall be filed by 6/1/2018, Defendants reply briefs shall be filed by 6/8/2018, and the motion hearing will take place as scheduled, on 6/15/2018 (rather than 6/8/2018 as indicated in the parties' stipulation), at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 72 OPPOSITION by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC to #58 Motion to Dismiss. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Dina E. Micheletti in support of #70 Opposition. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 70 OPPOSITION by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC to #67 Motion to Dismiss, #66 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Damion Hollomon Declaration)(Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION re #58 Motion to Dismiss, #67 Motion to Dismiss, #66 Motion to Dismiss by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF ERRATA/AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING re: #66 Motion to Dismiss by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator. Motion Hearing RESET for 6/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Bakes, Christopher) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to DISMISS by M. F. Bartlett, et al., Attorney Randall, Stephen Patrick added. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Randall, Stephen) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to DISMISS by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Caroline Crowder)(Bakes, Christopher) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss on Jurisdictional and Venue Grounds (ECF No. #64 ) is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Defendants the Incubator, the University Defendants, and TMinus6's last day to file motions to dismiss on jurisdiction and venue is set for 5/16/2018, and the motion(s) should be noticed for hearing on 6/15/2018 at 10:00 AM; Plaintiffs' last day to file opposition to all pending motions to dismiss is set for 5/30/2018; and Defendants' last day to file reply briefs is set for 6/8/2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2018 as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #58 ) is RESET for 6/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 64 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re #58 Motion to Dismiss by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC. (Fazio, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/4/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 3/15/18, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran, Phone number 916-448-2712 E-mail kohalloran@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (O'Halloran, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator for proceedings held on March 15, 2018 before Judge Mueller. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Bakes, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/26/2018 ORDERING that the time upon which Defendant shall have to respond to the First Amended Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to 5/16/2018. (Fabillaran, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 60 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bakes, Christopher) Modified on 4/26/2018 (Fabillaran, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/18/18. Added attorney Bryan Paul Sugar, PHV for USC/Columbia Technology Incubator. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by 52 App, Inc., Brendan Lee, John Owen, Christian Thibault, Tradeversity, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Declarations)(Rosen, David) Modified on 4/17/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 57 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator for attorney Bryan P. Sugar (corrected) to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bakes, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 56 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT ECF #57 ) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by USC/Columbia Technology Incubator for attorney Bryan P. Sugar to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7608948) (Bakes, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified on 4/17/2018 by C. Schultz) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher John Bakes on behalf of USC/Columbia Technology Incubator. Attorney Bakes, Christopher John added. (Bakes, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/5/2018: Discovery due by 3/8/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/5/2019. Any supplemental list of expert witnesses due by 4/26/2019. All expert discovery shall be completed by 5/31/2019. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 6/28/2019. The court will set a Final Pretrial Conference date after the resolution of any dispositive motions, or passage of the dispositive motion cutoff, with a trial date being determined at the pretrial conference. Objections due within 14 calendar days of service of this Order. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *T Minus 6, LLC, USC/Columbia Technology Incubator* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey L. Fazio* *Fazio Micheletti LLP* *2410 Camino Ramon, Ste. 315* *San Ramon, CA 94583*. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/3/18. The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Stipulation. Plaintiffs' amended complaint has been filed.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon.(Fazio, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/4/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to File First Amended Complaint by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTES for SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/15/2018. Attorney, Jeffrey Fazio, present on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorney, Stephen Randall, present for Defendants Pastides, Huntley, Kirkland, Hardaway Jr., Corder, Bartlett, and Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina. Attorney, David Rosen, present for Defendants Tomlin Jr., Meyers, Leicht, Lee, Thibault, Owen, Tradeversity Inc.; and 52Inc. Attorney, William Munoz, present for Defendants Cundari and Sowell & Grey and Associates. The court and counsel discussed an appropriate case schedule. A written scheduling order will issue. Court Reporter: Kelly OHalloran. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 48 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of a scheduling conflict and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/1/2018 is VACATED and RESET for 3/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. The court considers this new date FIRM. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED #45 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by M.F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina. (Randall, Stephen) Modified on 2/7/2018 (Reader, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Filing 45 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT ECF NO. #46 ) Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Patrick Randall on behalf of M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina. Attorney Randall, Stephen Patrick added. (Randall, Stephen) (Docket Text Modified on 2/8/2018 by C. Schultz: Disregard language added.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2018 ORDERING the Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/1/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 43 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina to #39 Ex Parte Request for Extension of Time. (Downey, Thomas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 42 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Donald Tomlin, Jr., Tradeversity, Inc. to #39 Ex Parte Request for Extension of Time. (Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 41 STATEMENT of NON - OPPOSITION to #39 Ex Parte Request for Extension of Tim by Defendant Sowell & Grey and Associates re 40 Minute Order. (Munoz, William) Modified on 1/4/2018 (Hunt, G). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Request for Order Extending Date of Initial Status Conference (ECF No. #39 ). Defendants shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition no later than 5:00 p.m. on January 4, 2018. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 39 EX PARTE REQUEST for 28-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Extend Date of Initial Status Conference by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fazio, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/3/2018 (Hunt, G). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 38 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/15/17 ORDERING that All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. The pending Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #19 , #20 , #22 ) that are currently under submission before the undersigned are VACATED. This matter is REFERRED back to the District Judge assigned to this action.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeffrey L Fazio on behalf of Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. Attorney Fazio, Jeffrey L added. (Fazio, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 15, 2017 Filing 35 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire: MOTION HEARING held on 11/15/2017 re #19 Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by 52inc., Steve Leicht, Tradeversity, Inc., Chris Thibault, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Brendan Lee, #20 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sowell & Grey and Associates, #22 Notice of hearing filed by Charles Hardaway, Jr., William Kirkland, Harry Huntley, Laura Corder, Harris Pastides, M. F. Bartlett, University of South Carolina, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina. The motions are submitted and the court will issue findings and recommendations. The plaintiffs are given thirty days from today's date to obtain counsel for this matter. Plaintiffs Counsel Damion Hollomon and Reyna Carrasco present. Defendants Counsel B. Natalie Vu, Mark Nagle and William Munoz present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mark Joseph Nagle on behalf of 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Donald Tomlin, Jr., Tradeversity, Inc. Attorney Nagle, Mark Joseph added. (Nagle, Mark) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina re #32 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Downey, Thomas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY by M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina in support of #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Downey, Thomas) Modified on 11/9/2017 (Fabillaran, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY by Tina Cundari, Sowell & Grey and Associates to #26 Opposition Attorney Munoz, William A. added. (Munoz, William) Modified on 11/9/2017 (Fabillaran, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY by 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Donald Tomlin, Jr., Tradeversity, Inc. to in support of #19 Amended Motion to Dismiss. (Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Damion Hollomon re #26 , #27 , and #28 Oppositions to Motions. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to #19 Amended Motion to Dismiss by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Fabillaran, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 27 OPPOSITION to #13 Motion to Dismiss by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Fabillaran, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to #20 Motion to Dismiss by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Fabillaran, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Kelly Truesdale. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 24 JOINDER by Donald Tomlin, Jr. in re #19 Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by 52inc. (Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE #22 Amended Notice of Motion Hearing. (Downey, Thomas) Modified on 11/9/2017 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 22 AMENDED #13 MOTION to DISMISS by defendants. Motion Hearing RESET for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of #13 Motion)(Downey, Thomas) Modified on 10/10/2017 (Becknal, R). Modified on 11/15/2017 (Donati, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 21 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sowell & Grey and Associates in re #20 Motion to Dismiss. (Munoz, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to DISMISS by Sowell & Grey and Associates. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tina Cundari, #3 Declaration of J. Calhoun Watson, #4 Declaration of William A. Munoz)(Munoz, [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 19 AMENDED #18 MOTION to DISMISS by 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Tradeversity, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Rosen, David) Modified on 10/4/2017 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Tradeversity, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Declarations)(Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of the Motions to Dismiss and/or Transfer Venue (ECF Nos. #12 , #13 , #15 ). The motions, as filed, are defective. Defendants are directed to comply with Local Rules 302(c)(21) and 230(a) and re-notice the motions before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 11/17/2017 hearing date before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 16 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sowell & Grey and Associates in re #15 Motion to Dismiss,. (Munoz, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Sowell & Grey and Associates. Attorney Munoz, William A. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Calhoun Watson, #3 Declaration of Tina Cundari, #4 Declaration of William A. Munoz)(Munoz, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina in support of #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Downey, Thomas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Harris Pastides, University of South Carolina. Attorney Downey, Thomas Michael added. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Downey, Thomas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by 52inc., Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Chris Thibault, Tradeversity, Inc.. Attorney Rosen, David Eric added. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Declarations)(Rosen, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chris Thibault served on 9/18/2017. (Hunt, G) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Laura Corder served on 9/12/2017; Tina Cundari served on 9/12/2017; Charles Hardaway, Jr. served on 9/12/2017; Harry Huntley served on 9/12/2017; Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina served on 9/12/2017; William Kirkland served on 9/12/2017; Michael Meyers served on; Harris Pastides served on 9/12/2017; Tradeversity, Inc. served on 9/12/2017; University of South Carolina served on 9/12/2017. (Hunt, G) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: 52inc. served on 9/11/2017; M. F. Bartlett served on 9/11/2017; Brendan Lee served on 9/11/2017; Steve Leicht served on 9/11/2017; John Owen served on 9/11/2017; Sowell & Grey and Associates served on 9/11/2017; Donald Tomlin, Jr. served on 9/11/2017. (Hunt, G) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 28, 2017 SERVICE IN PERSON: #7 Summons, #8 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *52inc., M. F. Bartlett, Laura Corder, Tina Cundari, Charles Hardaway, Jr., Harry Huntley, Jobs Economic Development Authority of South Carolina, William Kirkland, Brendan Lee, Steve Leicht, Michael Meyers, John Owen, Harris Pastides, Sowell & Grey and Associates, Chris Thibault, Donald Tomlin, Jr., Tradeversity, Inc., Kelly Truesdale, University of South Carolina* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Damion Hollomon* *Reyna Carrasco* *4411 Solano Road* *Fairfield, CA 94533*. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 28, 2017 RECEIPT number #CAE200084211 $400.00 fbo Reyna Carrasco by Reyna Carrasco on 8/28/2017. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 24, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2017 DENYING #4 , #5 Motions to Proceed IFP without prejudice to their renewal with all entries on the form completed; GRANTING the plaintiffs thirty (30) days to renew their IFP applications in proper form or to pay the filing fee; CAUTIONING the plaintiffs that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Damion Hollomon. (Nguyen, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reyna Carrasco. (Nguyen, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 16, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/15/17. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 10, 2017 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-AAA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartphonerecords, LLC et al v. University of South Carolina, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Thibault
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Tomlin, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 52 App, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Minus 6, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Corder
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradeversity, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Huntley
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meyers
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The South Carolina Jobs-Economic Development Authority
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Pastides
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Truesdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sowell & Grey and Associates
Represented By: William A. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USC/Columbia Technology Incubator
Represented By: Christopher John Bakes
Represented By: Bryan Paul Sugar, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Leicht
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Cundari
Represented By: William A. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hardaway, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Lee
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Owen
Represented By: Mark Joseph Nagle
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. F. Bartlett
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Carolina
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Jobs-Economic Development Authority, The
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Carolina, The
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Randall
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmartPhoneRecords, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fazio
Represented By: Dina Elizabeth Micheletti
Represented By: Mary McMullen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Hollomon
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fazio
Represented By: Dina Elizabeth Micheletti
Represented By: Mary McMullen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyna Carrasco
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fazio
Represented By: Dina Elizabeth Micheletti
Represented By: Mary McMullen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?