Hanley v. Ameris Bank
Plaintiff: Joshua M. Hanley
Defendant: Ameris Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv02687
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Joshua M. Hanley.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/5/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McDonald, Charles) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/28/2018) (cbru, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/15/2018. (cbru, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 12/19/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/14/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/14/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/14/2019, Discovery due by 5/13/2019, Motion in Limine due by 8/26/2019, Motions due by 5/28/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 9/16/2019, Mediation Due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/15/2018. (cbru, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/15/2018.(cbru, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin John Razi ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8108456) by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Shealy, Kirby)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Shealy, Kirby)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ameris Bank.(Shealy, Kirby)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby D Shealy, III on behalf of Ameris Bank (Shealy, Kirby)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua M. Hanley. Ameris Bank served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (McDonald, Charles) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/9/2018) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #1 Affidavit of Service) (cbru, ).
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ameris Bank. (cbru, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua M. Hanley.(cbru, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ameris Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8031378) filed by Joshua M. Hanley. Service due by 12/31/2018(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanley v. Ameris Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua M. Hanley
Represented By: Charles Harry McDonald
Represented By: Thornwell Forrest Sowell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameris Bank
Represented By: Kirby D Shealy, III
Represented By: Benjamin J Razi
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?