Virzi et al v. First Citizens Bank of South Carolina

Plaintiff: Michael Virzi and Natasha A Brenchak
Defendant: First Citizens Bank of South Carolina
Case Number: 3:2018cv02902
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on December 14, 2018. (kbos)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order a to First Citizens Bank by Natasha A Brenchak, Michael Virzi (Maxfield, David)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action, Response to Motion due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on December 3, 2018.(kbos)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action by Natasha A Brenchak, Michael Virzi. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Maxfield, David)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting parties' joint #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action, Response to Motion due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on November 6, 2018.(kbos)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action by Natasha A Brenchak, Michael Virzi. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Maxfield, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action by First Citizens Bank of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Arnette Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Unreported cases)No proposed order.(McCarrell, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledge of State Court Clerk)(McCarrell, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Natasha A Brenchak, Michael Virzi.(Maxfield, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by First Citizens Bank of South Carolina.(kbos)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Richland County, case number 2018-CP-40-5022. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8075173), filed by First Citizens Bank of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virzi et al v. First Citizens Bank of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Virzi
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha A Brenchak
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Citizens Bank of South Carolina
Represented By: Michael Kevin McCarrell
Represented By: Emily Irene Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?