United States of America v. Irmo South Carolina , Town of

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Irmo SC, Town of and Irmo South Carolina, Town of
Case Number: 3:2018cv03106
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay #11 Rule 16 Conference, staying the hearing until further notice. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr on 01/02/2019.(bshr, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re #11 Pretrial Order,,, Set Hearings,, (Unopposed) by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bowens, Barbara)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, January 16, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 12/21/18. (mflo, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Irmo South Carolina, Town of.(Lindemann, Andrew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Irmo South Carolina, Town of.(Lindemann, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Michelle A. McLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/5/18.(mflo, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle A. McLeod by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Sneed, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Irmo South Carolina, Town of served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Sneed, Robert)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Irmo SC, Town of. (mflo, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(mflo, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irmo SC, Town of, filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/14/2019(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Irmo South Carolina , Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irmo SC, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irmo South Carolina, Town of
Represented By: Andrew F Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert M Sneed
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Michelle Andrea McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?