Bowen v. Adidas America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brian Bowen, II
Defendant: Thomas Gassnola, James Gatto, Adidas America Inc, Christian Dawkins, Christopher Rivers, Merl Code and Munish Sood
Case Number: 3:2018cv03118
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint Adidas America Inc answer due 2/5/2019; Merl Code answer due 2/5/2019; Christopher Rivers answer due 2/5/2019. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/7/19.(mflo, ) Modified on 1/8/2019 to add text (mflo, ).
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE as to defendant James Gatto; answer due 2/5/2019. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/7/19.(mflo, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Dinkins, Mary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christopher Rivers. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Richardson, Matthew) Modified on 1/7/2019 to add text(mflo, ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Richardson, Matthew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE by James Gatto. Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barbier, Deborah)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah B Barbier on behalf of James Gatto (Barbier, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Bowen, II. Adidas America Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Adidas America, Inc.)(McLeod, W)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Christopher Rivers. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Thomas Gassnola. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Munish Sood. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Christian Dawkins. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Merl Code. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James Gatto. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Adidas America Inc. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brian Bowen, II.(mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christian Dawkins, Thomas Gassnola, James Gatto, Christopher Rivers, Munish Sood ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8114197.), filed by Brian Bowen, II. Service due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Louisville Agreement with Adidas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Federal Criminal Complaint)(mdea )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Adidas America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gassnola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gatto
Represented By: Deborah B Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America Inc
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rivers
Represented By: Cory E Manning
Represented By: Wesley Tyler Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merl Code
Represented By: Terry Allan Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munish Sood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bowen, II
Represented By: W Mullins McLeod, Jr
Represented By: Harry Cooper Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?