United States of America v. 8.59 Acres of Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 8.59 Acres of Land and Charles Bourgeois
Case Number: 3:2019cv00584
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Order for Immediate Delivery of Possession (Unopposed) by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bowens, Barbara) (Main Document 19 replaced on 4/26/2019) (cbru, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant Charles Bourgeois is reminded that Local Rule 26.01 includes Interrogatories F and G which are directed to defendants only. Please file answers to these interrogatories no later than May 8, 2019. (cbru, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charles Bourgeois.(Murphy, Christopher)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Murphy on behalf of Charles Bourgeois (Murphy, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIPT (#SCX300081807) for Deposit in the amount of $440,000.00 by United States of America. (cbru, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. 8.59 Acres of Land waiver executed on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Waiver of Service - Sumter Tax Assessor's Office)(Bowens, Barbara)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/25/2019.(cbru, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 3/18/2019.(cbru, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. Charles Bourgeois waiver executed on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service of Judicial Process)(Bowens, Barbara) Modified to edit text on 3/18/2019 (cbru, ).
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Baker by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Bowens, Barbara)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/27/2019.(cbru, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bhavna Changrani by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 3/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing)(cbru, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 3/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cbru, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(cbru, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION (cbru, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 8.59 Acres of Land, Charles Bourgeois (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 8.59 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.59 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bourgeois
Represented By: Christopher L Murphy
Represented By: John D Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bhavna Changrani
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Melissa L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?