Quest Leadership Academy et al v. South Carolina Public Charter School District et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Yolanda C. Ifill, Karen Hames, Quest Leadership Academy, Kristin White, Al Gray, Brenda Humbert, William A. Bridges, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr., Shameeka Wheeler and Tesheba Flemings
Defendant: Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District and South Carolina Public Charter School District Board of Trustees
Case Number: 3:2019cv01351
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1982
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 34. Reason: Attachment within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #35 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Kristin White, Tesheba Flemings, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Shameeka Wheeler, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill. South Carolina Public Charter School District Board of Trustees waiver executed on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver)(Turner, Tyler) Modified to edit text on 7/3/2019 (cbru, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Recommendation Report, #3 Exhibit B - Transcript from Revocation Hearing, #4 Exhibit C - Board Order, #5 Exhibit D - Adminstrative Appeal)No proposed order.(Knicely, Jonathan). Modified to correct motion relief and to add additional motion relief on 7/2/2019 (cbru, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie: Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 6/19/2019. Kevin Hall participates as potential counsel for defendant SC Public Charter School District Board of Trustees. Defendants SC Public Charter School District and Elliot Smalley to file updated motion to dismiss within 10 days; Plaintiffs to respond within 10 days thereafter. Court Reporter Kathleen Richardson. (mdea )
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District.(Norton, Erik)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Kristin White, Tesheba Flemings, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Shameeka Wheeler, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill. Elliot Smalley waiver executed on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Turner, Tyler) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/19/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Executed Waiver) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text on 6/19/2019 (cbru, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Kristin White, Tesheba Flemings, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Shameeka Wheeler, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill. South Carolina Public Charter School District waiver executed on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Turner, Tyler) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/19/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #2 Executed Waiver) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text on 6/19/2019 (cbru, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019 02:00 PM cancelled and rescheduled to 6/19/2019 02:00 PM before Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie. This hearing will be conducted via telephone. Plaintiff shall arrange a call-in number and provide all counsel and the court with call-in instructions by 12:00 PM on 6/18/2019. Please note that all counsel who intend to speak should be on a landline and not utilizing a cell phone or speakerphone. If it is not convenient to meet these requirements at the time scheduled, a request to reschedule should be made.(cbru, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019 02:00 PM before Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie. This hearing will be conducted via telephone. Plaintiff shall arrange a call-in number and provide all counsel and the court with call-in instructions by 12:00 PM on 6/18/2019. Please note that all counsel who intend to speak should be on a landline and not utilizing a cell phone or speakerphone. If it is not convenient to meet these requirements at the time scheduled, a request to reschedule should be made.(cbru, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District, South Carolina Public Charter School District Board of Trustees. (cbru, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William A. Bridges, Tesheba Flemings, Al Gray, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Quest Leadership Academy, Shameeka Wheeler, Kristin White, Gwendolyn H. Whitner.(Turner, Tyler) Modified to edit text on 6/17/2019 (cbru, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by William A. Bridges, Al Gray, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Quest Leadership Academy, Kristin White, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Tesheba Flemings, Shameeka Wheeler. No proposed order.(Turner, Tyler) Modified to add filers listed on document on 6/17/2019 (cbru, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District, South Carolina Public Charter School District Board of Trustees filed by Kristin White, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill, Tesheba Flemings, Shameeka Wheeler . Service due by 9/12/2019 (Turner, Tyler) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 6/17/2019 (cbru, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than June 28, 2019. (cbru, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 7/19/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/6/2019, Discovery due by 1/2/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/11/2020, Motions due by 1/15/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/25/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 2/12/2020, Mediation Due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/14/2019. (cbru, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District. Response to Motion due by 6/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recommendation Report)No proposed order.(Knicely, Jonathan) Modified to edit text on 6/13/2019 (cbru, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mark Knicely on behalf of Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District (Knicely, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION by Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District. (Norton, Erik)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8. Reason: Attachment within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Kristin White, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Signed Acceptance)(Turner, Tyler) Modified to edit text on 5/20/2019 (cbru, ).
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William A. Bridges, Al Gray, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Quest Leadership Academy, Kristin White, Gwendolyn H. Whitner.(Turner, Tyler) Modified to edit text on 5/16/2019 (cbru, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Quest Leadership Academy's response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #3 is incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 5/16/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/13/2019. (cbru, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Elliot Smalley. (cbru, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to South Carolina Public Charter School District. (cbru, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William A. Bridges, Al Gray, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Quest Leadership Academy, Kristin White, Gwendolyn H. Whitner.(cbru, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elliot Smalley, South Carolina Public Charter School District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8433594) filed by Kristin White, Robert N. Jenkins, Sr, Gwendolyn H. Whitner, Al Gray, Quest Leadership Academy, William A. Bridges, Karen Hames, Brenda Humbert, Yolanda C. Ifill. Service due by 8/6/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Leadership Academy et al v. South Carolina Public Charter School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn H. Whitner
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda C. Ifill
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hames
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Leadership Academy
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin White
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Gray
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Humbert
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Bridges
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert N. Jenkins, Sr.
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameeka Wheeler
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesheba Flemings
Represented By: Mary Allison Caudell
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Smalley
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Knicely
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Public Charter School District
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Knicely
Represented By: Erik Tison Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Public Charter School District Board of Trustees
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?