Martin v. Pratt Recycling, Inc.

Plaintiff: Annie Padilla Martin
Defendant: Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01490
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 Notice Other placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Annie Padilla Martin, 60536 Christian St., Vandalia, Michigan 49095 (dsto, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pratt Recycling, Inc..(McDonald, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pratt Recycling, Inc..(McDonald, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #11 Notice of Transfer to rae.gross@odnss.com, mcfarlandt@gc.adventist.org, and nicholas.huguelet@ogletree.com (dsto, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF TRANSFER. (dsto, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00013. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #2 Transfer Motion, #3 Transfer Order) (dsto, ).
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Annie Padilla Martin as to Pratt Recycling, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Huguelet, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (clw). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Of Limited Appearance by defendant Pratt Recycling, Inc. (Gross, Sharon) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for handling of all matters under 636(a) and 636(b)(1)(A) and for submission of recommendations on dispositive motions under 636(b)(1)(B); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Pratt Recycling, Inc. and returned to plaintff at county in Kalamazoo Clerk's Office (pjw) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (pjw). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]
January 8, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number KZ003705; for filing fee (pjw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pratt Recycling, Inc. filed by Annie Padilla Martin (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Padilla Martin
Represented By: Todd Robert McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Huguelet
Represented By: Sharon Rae Gross
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Miller
Represented By: Charles Edgar McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?