Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. W. et al

Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: P. W. and James Hutchison
Case Number: 3:2019cv01493
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by P. W..(Milling, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/13/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/15/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/13/2019, Discovery due by 2/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 2/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/20/2020, Mediation Due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/19/2019. (cbru, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant P.W. is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 2, 2019. (cbru, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by P. W..(Milling, Jonathan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. James Hutchison waiver executed on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Harris, David) Modified to edit text on 7/8/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/8/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #1 Executed Waiver) (cbru, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. P. W. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Harris, David) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/13/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 Proof of Service) (cbru, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James Hutchison. (cbru, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to P. W. (cbru, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/23/2019) (cbru, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Hutchison, P. W. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8460324) filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Service due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Penn National Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Loss Notice-Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter - Redacted)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. W. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. W.
Represented By: Jonathan M Milling
Represented By: Sandra Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hutchison
Represented By: Mark Weston Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Grant Harris, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?